Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Roderick C Young
Referred: Mark R Colombell
Case #: 3:23-cv-00344
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Terminated:Jul 25, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 22, 2024
10 10 misc Letter Mon 04/22 4:26 PM
Letter received from Antoine E. Harris.(Kski, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 01, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/02 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Antoine Eugene Harris.(adun, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, August 04, 2023
8 8 misc Mail Returned Fri 08/04 1:46 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Antoine Eugene Harris. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
7 7 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 07/25 4:46 PM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE- IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Plaintiff failed to keep the Court informed of his current address. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Defendants Nurse Martin, Judge Vaughan, Turner, Lt. Shaw, and Mr. Walker. Signed by Clerk on 7/25/2023. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (adun, )
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/25 4:31 PM
ORDER that the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Plaintiff failed to keep the Court informed of his current address. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter a final appealable Judgment in a Civil Case in favor of Defendants as a separate entry on the docket. The Court does not grant leave to amend, rendering this Order final and appealable. Should Plaintiff desire to appeal, a written notice of appeal must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within 30 days of the date of entry hereof. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 7/25/2023. Copy of Opinion and Order mailed to Plaintiff. (adun, )
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 07/25 4:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 7/25/2023. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
4 4 misc Mail Returned Tue 07/18 9:11 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Antoine Eugene Harris. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/15 11:58 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Non-Prisoner Action)- The Clerk is DIRECTED to CONDITIONALLY docket this action. Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof. The Court is forwarding to Plaintiff the non-prisoner in forma pauperis affidavit for compliance. Failure to complete the affidavit in its entirety will result in summary dismissal of the action. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 6/15/2023. Copy of Order and non-prisoner IFP mailed to Plaintiff. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/24 11:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antoine Eugene Harris. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Wed 05/24 11:40 AM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against Nurse Martin, Shaw, Turnner, Judge Vaughan, and Walker filed by Antoine Eugene Harris.(jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
misc Consent/Decline to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/24 11:41 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Antoine Eugene Harris. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]