Lobato et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02213 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:23-cv-03630 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:50 AM EST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Priutt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Schwechel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aaron Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracey Padgett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roger Oates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alonzo Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Molden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donnie McDaniel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abdus Luqman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Loftin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kent Lobato
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Reid
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bucky Robbins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Ropiecki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fredrick Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Sharpe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Simien
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leann Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Wiederecht
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Thormahlen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Barnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Bauer
#0409 Greenville County Detention Center 20 McGee Street
Greenville, SC 29601 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Bent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Bonds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Bourne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Brown Kastro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Faust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Garcia
#92235 Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) P.O. Box 6000
Sterling, CO 80751 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Gooch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Haley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jemma Leger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Hammonds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donnie Heater
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emilie Hebert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Jefferson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Johnson
Charleston County Detention Center 3841 Leeds Avenue
Charleston, SC 29405 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Kindred
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Kingan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Knapp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Knott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Timothy Adams, Sylvia Gomez, Joseph Pettis, Gregory Rocha, Claudis Anderson, Eric Bryant, Darryl Ford, Tammy Metz, Paul Clennon, Karl O. Kendall, Larry Taylor, Gregory Molden, Aaron Perez, Charles Dykstra, Kenneth Hinshaw, Helen Edwards, Nicholas (I) Krause, Kristina Lipsky, Curtis Colbert, Jeffrey Rainwater, Rosendo Contreras Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peter Bonds, James Brown Kastro, Troy Jefferson, Jemma Leger, Donnie McDaniel, Roger Oates, Douglas Priutt, John Reid, John Wiederecht, Alonzo Williams, Robert Brockway, Ronald Brown, John Giangreco, Troy Henderson, Desean Howard, Franky McGee, Randall Morris, Tammy Norton, Robert Ritter, Jr., Fabian Romero, Michael Schwab, Timothy Thomas, Robert McLauchlan, Donald Miletello, Sean Patterson, Emil Rodriguez, Scott Tutrow, Tabetha Alonzo, Jenna Carroll, Jimmy Easton, Elizabeth Garcia, Persophone Guitron, Mike Jackson, Mike Jackson, Ilyea Shanz, Teaff Toka, Timothy Vaden, David and Ethan Acuff, Joe Bankston, Sherry and Hector Castro, Judy Haralson, Elizabeth Hill, Carla Hilton, Kevin Roberts, Derrick and Patricia Veanueva Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ethan Acuss without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Acuff, Ethan; Ramirez, Emma; Ramirez, Nelda; Erwin, Tina; Greer, Ron; Hanes, Jeffrey; Harris, Oliver; Ramirez, Maria; Reedy, Eric; Romero, Jesus; Smith, Constance; Smith, Timothy; Thompson, James E; Vega, Luis; Bent, James; Davis, Marvin; Jones, Andre M; Kindred, David W.; Luqman, Abdus; Robbins, Bucky; Adley, Sabrina; Bankston, Jedediah; Ivie, Joe; Lowe, Allanah; Lowe, Deshawe; Martin, Eldon; Sager, David; Sager, NicoleAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-02144-RMG, 2:23-cv-02145-RMG, 2:23-cv-02213-RMG, 2:23-cv-02217-RMG(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/24/2023), 1:23-cv-03630, Lobato et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02213-RMG (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5
![]() Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-03630. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 05/24 2:18 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 5/24/2023), 1:23-cv-03630, Lobato et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-02213-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/12/2023) (tro) |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(tro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District per MDL
Wed 05/24 12:12 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(tro) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/24/2023.] | ||
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |