Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-00682
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Terminated:Aug 15, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
11 11 order So Ordered Tue 08/15 5:41 PM
So Ordered in re10 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 8/15/2023. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/11 1:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Antonio Donis, Ur Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray. (Spavins, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 08/09 12:50 PM
ORDERED that the Motion8 is GRANTED . Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 18, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 8/9/2023. (tran)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Fri 08/04 1:02 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Antonio Donis, Ur Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray.(Spavins, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/04 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Spavins on behalf of Antonio Donis, Ur Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray (Spavins, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Fri 06/16 1:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Antonio Donis, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ted Kim, Christopher Wray, Merrick Garland, Jessica Aber on June 12 2023, filed by Hidayat Khan. (Golesorkhi-Zahedi, Parastoo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Tue 05/30 12:16 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Dree K. Collopy for Hidayat Khan. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 5/30/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 05/26 12:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Antonio Donis, Ur Jaddou, Ted H. Kim, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christopher A. Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Wed 05/24 3:09 PM
Proposed Summons by Hidayat Khan. (Golesorkhi-Zahedi, Parastoo)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/24 3:08 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ava Cayetano Benach and Certification of Local Counsel Parastoo Golesorkhi Zahedi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8951126. by Hidayat Khan. (Golesorkhi-Zahedi, Parastoo)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/24 3:03 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8951114.), filed by Hidayat Khan.(Golesorkhi-Zahedi, Parastoo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Thu 05/25 11:41 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Dest)
Related: [-]