Strike 3 v. Doe
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Tolliver Giles |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00685 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Report Regarding Copyright
Mon 07/24 3:46 PM
Final Report on the filing or determination of an action.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Final Order | ||
9 | 9
order
So Ordered
Mon 07/24 3:40 PM
So Ordered re8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Strike 3. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 07/24/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/21 9:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Strike 3 (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Thu 06/22 5:27 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 06/22/2023. (dvanm) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Waiver of
Thu 06/22 11:51 AM
Waiver of Oral Argument by Strike 3 (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
5 | 5
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 06/22 11:50 AM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party filed by Strike 3.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Williamson Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Paige Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Stalzer Declaration | ||
4 | 4
motion
Discovery
Thu 06/22 11:49 AM
MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party by Strike 3.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 05/24 10:06 PM
NOTICE by Strike 3(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 10:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3. (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/24 10:04 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8951772.), filed by Strike 3.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 05/25 8:19 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (dvanm) |