Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00686 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
utility
Report Regarding Copyright
Wed 10/25 2:35 PM
Final Report on the filing or determination of an action. (swil) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/25 2:32 PM
ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(l)(A)(i), the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in re12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/25/2023. (swil) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 10/20 9:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 08/23 9:27 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff shall have until October 24, 2023 to effectuate service of a summons and Complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/23/2023. (Dcrow, ) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Waiver of
Wed 08/23 6:20 AM
Waiver of re9 MOTION for Extension To Effectuate Service Oral Argument by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of
Wed 08/23 6:16 AM
MOTION for Extension To Effectuate Service by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Thu 06/22 1:58 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/22/2023. (swil) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Waiver of
Thu 06/22 11:53 AM
Waiver of Oral Argument by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
6 | 6
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 06/22 11:53 AM
Memorandum in Support re5 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Williamson Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Paige Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Stalzer Declaration | ||
5 | 5
motion
Discovery
Thu 06/22 11:52 AM
MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 05/24 10:13 PM
NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO121(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 10:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 05/24 10:11 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/24 10:10 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8951776.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 05/25 8:35 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (swil) |