Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Trenga |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00690 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 26, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Report Regarding Copyright
Thu 10/26 7:41 AM
Final Report on the filing or determination of an action. (swil) |
|
12 | 12
order
So Ordered
Thu 10/26 7:38 AM
So Ordered in re11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/26/2023. (swil) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 10/25 7:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 08/24 11:49 PM
ORDER granting8 MOTION for Extension To Effectuate Service . Plaintiff shall have until October 27, 2023 to effectuate service of a summons and Complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 8/24/2023. (Dest) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Waiver of
Wed 08/23 6:30 AM
Waiver of re8 MOTION for Extension To Effectuate Service Oral Argument by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of
Wed 08/23 6:29 AM
MOTION for Extension To Effectuate Service by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Thu 06/22 4:47 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 6/22/2023. (swil) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Waiver of
Thu 06/22 12:05 PM
Waiver of Oral Argument by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
5 | 5
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 06/22 12:04 PM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Williamson Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Paige Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Stalzer Declaration | ||
4 | 4
motion
Discovery
Thu 06/22 12:03 PM
MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 05/24 10:37 PM
NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO 121 Report on Filing Copyright(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 10:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/24 10:33 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8951793.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 05/25 8:51 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (swil) |