Operand Pharmaceuticals Holdco II Limited
Member Case
Lead case is: 7:22-bk-22549
Lead case is: 7:22-bk-22549
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | James L Garrity Jr |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-10838 |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2024 |
Debtor
Operand Pharmaceuticals Holdco II Limited
1400 Atwater Drive
Malvern, PA 19355 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, December 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order signed on 12/5/2024 (I) Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases; (II) Granting Final Decrees in Certain Closed Chapter 11 Cases: (III) Amending Caption of Remaining Cases: and (IV) Granting Related Relief. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 12/05 11:05 PM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Andrew Matott on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals Holdco II Limited. (Matott, Andrew) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b))- Form 2030 Filed by Lisa Laukitis on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals Holdco II Limited. (Laukitis, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Thu 06/08 10:14 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC, added to the case. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information /(Hearing Date: 6/22/2023 at 11:00 AM, Objection Deadline: 6/15/2023 at 4:00 PM) Notice of Hearing and Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs for the Additional Debtors and Any Future Debtors (Attachment: Ex. A: Proposed Order) filed by Kyle J. Ortiz on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals Holdco II Limited with hearing to be held on 6/22/2023 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JLG) Objections due by 6/15/2023,. (Ortiz, Kyle) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Kyle J. Ortiz on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals Holdco II Limited. (Ortiz, Kyle) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Summary of Assets and Liabilities Filed by Kyle J. Ortiz on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals Holdco II Limited. (Ortiz, Kyle) |
|
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Fri 05/26 3:00 PM
Case Jointly Administrated with Case # 22-22549 per Order signed on 8/17/2022 in Case # 22-22549 Doc # 45. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Statement /Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Cases and Joint Administration filed by Paul D. Leake on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals Holdco II Limited. (Leake, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Case Designated As Mega as per LBR 1073-1. Filed by Paul D. Leake of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals Holdco II Limited. (Leake, Paul) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 05/25 11:20 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-10838 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16216658. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Add Judge
Thu 05/25 11:30 AM
Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. added to the case. (Harris, Kendra) |