Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:23-cv-00692
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action
Case Filed:May 25, 2023
Terminated:Jun 27, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2023 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Plaintiff
Emily Jean Clendenin
Represented By
John William Goodman
Murray Osorio PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Megan Marianne Clendenin
Represented By
John William Goodman
Murray Osorio PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
5 5 order So Ordered Tue 06/27 12:37 PM
So Ordered in re4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 6/27/2023. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/26 6:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emily Jean Clendenin, Megan Marianne Clendenin (Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 05/26 12:24 AM
Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Thursday, May 25, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 05/25 1:02 PM
Proposed Summons by Emily Jean Clendenin, Megan Marianne Clendenin. (Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/25 1:01 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8952946.), filed by Emily Jean Clendenin, Megan Marianne Clendenin.(Goodman, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Plaintiff Emilys N-600 Biometrics Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, Plaintiff Megans N-600 Biometrics Notice,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Fri 05/26 12:20 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Dest)
Related: [-]