Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:23-bk-10777

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 2:23-ap-00046
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 25, 2023
Terminated:Sep 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
James Plewes
468 Long Lane
Huntingdon Valley, PA 19006
Represented By
BRAD J. SADEK
Sadek And Cooper
contact info
Plaintiff
The CVC Group Inc.
Represented By
JEFFREY P. BRYMAN
Law Offices Of Kenneth R Pyle
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:10 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/27 10:15 AM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-46 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (B., John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 09/12 11:32 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:23-ap-46 judgment by default entered. (B., John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 08/24 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/23/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #16 )
17 17 court CHAP - Hearing Held (Adv) Wed 08/23 8:15 AM
Hearing Held on11 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by The CVC Group Inc..Cert of no ans filed. Order entered on 8/21/23. (B., Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 08/21 12:01 PM
Order. It is hereby Ordered that Judgment by Default is entered against the Defendant. Related [+]. (B., John)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
15 15 misc Certificate of No Response Wed 08/16 9:16 AM
Certificate of No Response to Motion for Entry of Judgment by Default Filed by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN on behalf of The CVC Group Inc. Related [+]. (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, July 24, 2023
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/24 11:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN on behalf of The CVC Group Inc. Related [+]. (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 12 ,11 ,13
13 13 notice Notice of Motion Mon 07/24 5:53 PM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by The CVC Group Inc.. Hearing scheduled 8/23/2023 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom #1. (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment
12 12 misc Brief Mon 07/24 2:29 PM
Brief Filed by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN on behalf of The CVC Group Inc. Related [+]. (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Default Judgment Mon 07/24 2:24 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by The CVC Group Inc. Represented by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN (Counsel). (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 07/13 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
9 9 court Default Entered Wed 07/12 3:23 PM
Default Entered Against Defendant James Plewes. (B., John)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Affidavit Wed 07/12 3:19 PM
Affidavit Re: Amended Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default Filed by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN on behalf of The CVC Group Inc. Related [+]. (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/12 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN on behalf of The CVC Group Inc. Related [+]. (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 6 ,4 ,5
Monday, July 10, 2023
6 6 misc Request for Default Mon 07/10 8:52 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN on behalf of The CVC Group Inc.. (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
5 5 2 pgs misc Affidavit Mon 07/10 8:44 PM
Affidavit Re: sur Request for Entry of Default Filed by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN on behalf of The CVC Group Inc.. (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/10 7:57 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN on behalf of The CVC Group Inc. Related [+]. (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 2
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
3 3 order Default Status Mon 07/10 2:28 PM
It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall take appropriate action to prosecute this proceeding (see e.g. F.R.C.P. 55) within 14 days of the date of this order. Upon failure to prosecute this proceeding on or before July 24, 2023., this adversary proceeding may be dismissed for lack of prosecution without further notice or opportunity for a hearing.. (D., Tasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 05/26 12:47 PM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) James Plewes Date Issued 5/26/2023, Answer Due 6/26/2023. (B., John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/25 10:54 AM
Adversary case 23-00046 Complaint by JEFFREY P. BRYMAN on behalf of The CVC Group Inc. against James Plewes. Fee Amount $350 . (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (BRYMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit
Att: 4 24 pgs Exhibit
Att: 5 32 pgs Exhibit
Att: 6 2 pgs Exhibit
Att: 7 9 pgs Exhibit
Att: 8 20 pgs Exhibit
Att: 9 11 pgs Exhibit