California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:23-cv-02602
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:May 25, 2023
Terminated:Dec 28, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2023 12:36 AM PST
Defendant
Enrique Conterno
Represented By
Tijana Martinovic Brien
Cooley LLP
contact info
Amie Lea Simmons
Cooley LLP
contact info
Brett Hom De Jarnette
Cooley LLP
contact info
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pat Cotroneo
Represented By
Tijana Martinovic Brien
Cooley LLP
contact info
Amie Lea Simmons
Cooley LLP
contact info
Brett Hom De Jarnette
Cooley LLP
contact info
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark Eisner
Represented By
Tijana Martinovic Brien
Cooley LLP
contact info
Amie Lea Simmons
Cooley LLP
contact info
Brett Hom De Jarnette
Cooley LLP
contact info
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Peony K Yu
Represented By
Bruce A. Ericson
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
contact info
Defendant
James A. Schoeneck
Represented By
Tijana Martinovic Brien
Cooley LLP
contact info
Amie Lea Simmons
Cooley LLP
contact info
Brett Hom De Jarnette
Cooley LLP
contact info
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fibrogen, Inc.
Represented By
Tijana Martinovic Brien
Cooley LLP
contact info
Amie Lea Simmons
Cooley LLP
contact info
Brett Hom De Jarnette
Cooley LLP
contact info
Patrick Edward Gibbs
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P.
Represented By
Michael James Hampson
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Lawrence M. Rolnick
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Ritholtz
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P
Represented By
Michael James Hampson
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Lawrence M. Rolnick
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Ritholtz
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Farallon Capital Partners, L.P.
Represented By
Michael James Hampson
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Lawrence M. Rolnick
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Ritholtz
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P.
Represented By
Michael James Hampson
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Lawrence M. Rolnick
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Ritholtz
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P.
Represented By
Michael James Hampson
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Lawrence M. Rolnick
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Ritholtz
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P.
Represented By
Michael James Hampson
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Lawrence M. Rolnick
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Ritholtz
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P.
Represented By
Michael James Hampson
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Lawrence M. Rolnick
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Ritholtz
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P.
Represented By
Michael James Hampson
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Lawrence M. Rolnick
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Ritholtz
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P.
Represented By
Michael James Hampson
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
James Austin Long
The Long Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Lawrence M. Rolnick
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Ritholtz
Rolnick Kramer Sadighi LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 13 2024
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (235) Motion for Settlement in case 3:21-cv-02623-EMC. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2024)
GPO May 28 2024
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (250) Motion for Settlement in case 3:21-cv-02623-EMC. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
42 42 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 05/28 5:50 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (250) Motion for Settlement in case 3:21-cv-02623-EMC. (emclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
41 41 17 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 02/13 5:27 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting (235) Motion for Settlement in case 3:21-cv-02623-EMC. (emclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
40 40 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Fri 01/05 12:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Joint Status Report due by 2/20/2024. Status Conference set for 2/27/2024, at 2:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Edward M Chen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. ALL COUNSEL PARTICIPATING IN THE HEARING ARE REQUIRED TO LOG INTO ZOOM NO LATER THAN 2:20 PM Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/emc General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
39 39 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/20 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P. (Long, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
38 38 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/04 4:59 PM
ORDER re Statement Chart and 31 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James A. Schoeneck, Enrique Conterno, Mark Eisner, Peony K Yu, Pat Cotroneo, Fibrogen, Inc. Hearing Schedule (emclc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
37 37 misc Response ( Non Motion ) Fri 11/03 3:54 PM
RESPONSE re33 Request for Judicial Notice, by Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P.. (Long, James)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 11/03 3:47 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byFarallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P.. (Long, James)
Related: [-] 31 MOTION to Dismiss
Thursday, September 21, 2023
35 35 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 09/21 2:48 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Peony K Yu Certification of Interested Entities or Person of Defendant K. Peony Yu, M.D. [Civ. L.R. 3-15] (Ericson, Bruce)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A. Ericson Notice of Appearance for Defendant K. Peony Yu, M.D. (Ericson, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
33 33 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Wed 09/20 11:22 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re31 MOTION to Dismiss filed byEnrique Conterno, Pat Cotroneo, Mark Eisner, Fibrogen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck, Peony K Yu. Related [+] (Gibbs, Patrick)
Related: [-] 31
Att: 1 Proposed Order
32 32 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 09/20 11:18 PM
Declaration of Tijana M. Brien in Support of31 MOTION to Dismiss filed byEnrique Conterno, Pat Cotroneo, Mark Eisner, Fibrogen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck. Related [+] (Gibbs, Patrick)
Related: [-] 31
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W,
Att: 24 Exhibit X,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y,
Att: 26 Exhibit Z,
Att: 27 Exhibit AA,
Att: 28 Exhibit BB,
Att: 29 Exhibit CC,
Att: 30 Exhibit DD,
Att: 31 Exhibit EE,
Att: 32 Exhibit FF,
Att: 33 Exhibit GG,
Att: 34 Exhibit HH,
Att: 35 Exhibit II,
Att: 36 Exhibit JJ,
Att: 37 Exhibit KK,
Att: 38 Exhibit LL,
Att: 39 Exhibit MM,
Att: 40 Exhibit NN,
Att: 41 Exhibit OO,
Att: 42 Exhibit PP,
Att: 43 Exhibit QQ,
Att: 44 Exhibit RR,
Att: 45 Exhibit SS,
Att: 46 Exhibit TT,
Att: 47 Exhibit UU,
Att: 48 Exhibit VV
31 31 motion Dismiss Wed 09/20 10:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Enrique Conterno, Pat Cotroneo, Mark Eisner, Fibrogen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck, Peony K Yu. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. Responses due by 10/4/2023. Replies due by 10/11/2023.(Gibbs, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 28, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 07/28 4:40 PM
Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING 27 STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER.(vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Proposed Order Fri 07/28 3:51 PM
Proposed Order re28 Proposed Order [Corrected] by Enrique Conterno, Pat Cotroneo, Mark Eisner, Fibrogen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck. (De Jarnette, Brett)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Proposed Order Fri 07/28 2:49 PM
Proposed Order re27 Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order by Enrique Conterno, Pat Cotroneo, Mark Eisner, Fibrogen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck. (De Jarnette, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
27 27 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 07/24 10:48 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Scheduling filed by Enrique Conterno, Pat Cotroneo, Mark Eisner, Fibrogen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck. (De Jarnette, Brett)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 07/24 10:20 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Enrique Conterno, Pat Cotroneo, Mark Eisner, Fibrogen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck identifying Other Affiliate PRIMECAP Management Company, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Fibrogen, Inc.. (De Jarnette, Brett)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/24 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amie Lea Simmons (Simmons, Amie)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/24 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Edward Gibbs (Gibbs, Patrick)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/24 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tijana Martinovic Brien (Brien, Tijana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
22 22 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/20 3:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P.. Service waived by James A. Schoeneck waiver sent on 6/2/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/20 3:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P.. Service waived by Fibrogen, Inc. waiver sent on 6/2/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/20 3:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P.. Service waived by Mark Eisner waiver sent on 6/2/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/20 3:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P.. Service waived by Pat Cotroneo waiver sent on 6/2/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 06/20 3:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P.. Service waived by Enrique Conterno waiver sent on 6/2/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Rolnick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/16 9:14 AM
Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Ritholtz.(vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/16 9:09 AM
Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Hampson.(vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/16 9:03 AM
Order by Judge Edward M Chen GRANTING 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lawrence Rolnick.(vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/14 1:40 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18360488.) filed by Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P..(Ritholtz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/14 1:37 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18360464.) filed by Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P..(Hampson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/14 1:34 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18360446.) filed by Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P..(Rolnick, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
11 11 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/14 9:03 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Edward M Chen. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order Relating Case Tue 06/13 1:19 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/2023. (vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Fri 06/09 8:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/23/2023 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 6/23/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/08 8:04 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P.. Service waived by Peony K Yu waiver sent on 6/2/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Long, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/26 11:15 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 05/26 11:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Enrique Conterno, Pat Cotroneo, Mark Eisner, Fibrogen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck, Peony K Yu. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 05/25 3:41 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/8/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/25 3:30 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P. (Long, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/25 3:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P. (Long, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 05/25 3:25 PM
Proposed Summons. (Long, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 97 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/25 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Enrique Conterno, Pat Cotroneo, Mark Eisner, Fibrogen, Inc., James A. Schoeneck, Peony K Yu ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18303099.). Filed byFarallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital F5 Master I, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital (AM) Investors, L.P., Farallon Capital Offshore Investors II, L.P, Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P., Farallon Healthcare Partners Master, L.P., Four Crossings Institutional Partners, L.P..(Long, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet