Nevada District Court
Judge:Richard F Boulware, II
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-00824
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 25, 2023
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, NV, A-23-868157-C
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2023 12:52 AM PST
Defendant
Hankins & Sohn Plastic Surgery Associates
Represented By
Marta D Kurshumova
Jones Lovelock
contact info
Gary E. Schnitzer
Kravitz Schnitzer Johnson & Watson, Chtd.
contact info
L. Renee Green
Kravitz Schnitzer Johnson & Watson, Chtd.
contact info
Leslie L. Phiefer
Kravitz Schnitzer Johnson & Watson Chtd.
contact info
Defendant
Hankins Plastic Surgery Associates, P.C.
Represented By
Marta D Kurshumova
Jones Lovelock
contact info
Gary E. Schnitzer
Kravitz Schnitzer Johnson & Watson, Chtd.
contact info
L. Renee Green
Kravitz Schnitzer Johnson & Watson, Chtd.
contact info
Leslie L. Phiefer
Kravitz Schnitzer Johnson & Watson Chtd.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Tausinga
Represented By
Nicholas Colella
Lynch Carpenter LLP
contact info
Valerie S. Gray
The Bourassa Law Group
contact info
Mark J Bourassa
The Bourassa Law Group, LLC
contact info
Valerie Christian
The Bourassa Law Group
contact info
Jennifer A. Fornetti
The Bourassa Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Olga Romashova
Represented By
Jennifer A. Fornetti
The Bourassa Law Group
contact info
Raina C. Borrelli
Turke & Strauss LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alysia Wrenn
Represented By
Ramzy P Ladah
Ladah Law Firm
contact info
Jennifer A. Fornetti
The Bourassa Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
112 112 minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/23 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/23/2025. In light of the 111 Order staying discovery and all upcoming hearings and deadlines while the parties engage in mediation to explore resolution of this action, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 76 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to refile if a resolution is not reached. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IML)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
111 111 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Compel Order on Stipulation Tue 04/22 2:10 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2025 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Crtrm Administrator: A. Reyes ; Pla Counsel: Jennifer Fornetti ; Def Counsel: Chelsea Hueth and Frank Roussier ; Court Reporter: Liberty Recorder ; Time of Hearing: 1:55 p.m. - 2:05 p.m. ; Courtroom: 3A ; Plaintiff and Defendants' counsel are present. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears the representations of counsel as to 97 Motion to Compel Discovery and 110 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that 97 Motion to Compel Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 110 Stipulation to Stay Discovery is GRANTED. The parties are to file a status report on or before June 23, 2025. The transcript of these proceedings will serve as the official Order of the Court. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
110 110 motion Stipulation Mon 04/21 2:57 PM
STIPULATION TO STAY DISCOVERY by Consol Plaintiff Caroline Aurora, Plaintiffs Jennifer Tausinga, Sarah Jefferson, Alysia Wrenn. (Fornetti, Jennifer) (stay) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
109 109 minord Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion Fri 04/18 11:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/18/2025. Before the Court for consideration is the 76 MOTION to Dismiss 75 Amended Complaint by Defendant Hankins Plastic Surgery Associates, P.C.. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2025 at 10:45 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
Related: [-]