Keesecker v. Cabel
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Roderick C Young |
Referred: | Mark R Colombell |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00345 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/25 4:29 PM
ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: The action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide Petitioner with a copy of his § 2254 Petition; and, A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Should Petitioner desire to appeal, a written notice of appeal must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 7/25/2023. (Copy mailed to Keesecker with copy of his §2254 petition) (smej, ) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Tue 07/25 4:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 7/25/2023. (Copy mailed to Keesecker) (smej, ) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Response Other
Tue 07/11 5:10 PM
Response to3 Memorandum Order, filed by Michael Keesecker. (One time courtesy copy of ECF 1 mailed to Mr. Keesecker) (smej, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Fri 06/30 12:58 PM
Letter from Michael Keesecker. Copy of docket sheet mailed to Petitioner. (smej, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/13 12:20 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER - Petitioner is DIRECTED to show cause within thirty (30) days as to why his § 2254 motion should not be dismissed for lack of exhaustion. Failing to do so will result in the dismissal of Petitioners motion without prejudice to re-file after Petitioner has exhausted his state court remedies for all of his claims. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 6/13/2023. (Copy mailed to Keesecker) (smej, ) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 06/06 9:25 AM
Filing Fee Received: $5.00, Receipt Number: 300001455. (smej, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Thu 05/25 11:59 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Keesecker. (smej, ) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2, | ||
Att: 3 Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope |