Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:M Hannah Lauck
Referred: Mark R Colombell
Case #: 3:23-cv-00346
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Terminated:Jun 05, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
9 9 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 07/19 3:55 PM
RULE 42(b) MANDATE re6 Notice of Appeal - This court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42(b) takes effect today. 23-6618 (smej, )
Related: [-]
8 8 appeal USCA Order Wed 07/19 3:54 PM
ORDER of USCA as to6 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel W. Jamison. Upon consideration of the motion to voluntarily dismiss this case pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, the court grants the motion. 23-6618 (smej, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
appeal USCA Case Number Mon 06/26 2:04 PM
USCA Case Number 23-6618 Case Manager K. Hancock, for6 Notice of Appeal filed by Daniel W. Jamison. (smej, )
Related: [-]
appeal Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA Mon 06/26 2:17 PM
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re6 Notice of Appeal (smej, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
7 7 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA Fri 06/23 10:17 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re6 Notice of Appeal. (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
6 6 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 06/21 3:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Daniel W. Jamison.(Kat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, June 05, 2023
5 5 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 06/05 12:29 PM
JUDGMENT in a Civil Case - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Jamison's claims and the action are DISMISSED as FRIVOLOUS and MALICIOUS; The Clerk is DIRECTED to note the disposition of the action for the purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the defendants, David Robinson, Natarcha Gregg and Paul Ohia. Signed by Clerk on 6/5/2023. (Copy mailed to Jamison) (smej, )
Related: [-]
4 4 order Dismissed Pursuant to 28USC1915A Mon 06/05 10:43 AM
FINAL ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that: Jamison's claims and the action are DISMISSED as FRIVOLOUS and MALICIOUS; The Clerk is DIRECTED to note the disposition of the action for the purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); and, The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter a final appealable Judgment in a Civil Case in favor of Defendants as a separate entry on the docket. Should Jamison desire to appeal, a written notice of appeal must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/5/2023. (Copy mailed to Jamison) (smej, )
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 06/05 10:41 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/5/2023. (Copy mailed to Jamison) (smej, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/25 11:44 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel W. Jamison. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Account Statement,
Att: 2 Pleading,
Att: 3 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Thu 05/25 11:44 AM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against Natarcha Gregg, M.S.A, RD, Paul Ohia, MD, David Robinson, filed by Daniel W. Jamison. (smej, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope