Cash v. City of Durant, et al
Original Case: 6:22-cv-00009
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-pr-07033 |
Type | prisoner appeal / federal / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 3:57 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF DURANT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHRIS CICIO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
TIMOTHY MCEACHERN
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
BRYAN COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISIONERS
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNKNOWN OFFICERS, Durant Police Department
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
UNKNOWN OFFICERS, Bryan County Sheriff's Department
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL LYNN CASH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/13/2024 3:57 AM MDT |
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
[11001533] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/24/2023. Fee or 1915 forms and notice of appearance due 06/23/2023 for Michael Lynn Cash. Notice of appearance due on 06/07/2023 for Chris Cicio and City of Durant. 23-7033 | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |