Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Jamar K Walker
Referred: Douglas E Miller
Case #: 2:23-cv-00230
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:Jul 14, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:32 AM EST
Defendant
Ur M Jaddou
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
20 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20008
Plaintiff
Giovanni Geneveo Geronilla
Represented By
David Elliott Gluckman
Mccandlish Holton
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 13, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 07/13 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Giovanni Geneveo Geronilla (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 06/15 1:42 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 06/06 1:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Giovanni Geneveo Geronilla. All Defendants. (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 05/30 11:35 AM
Four (4) Summonses Issued as to Ur M Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
Friday, May 26, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 05/26 12:03 PM
Proposed Summons by Giovanni Geneveo Geronilla. (Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/26 11:59 AM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8955024.), filed by Giovanni Geneveo Geronilla.(Gluckman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 05/30 11:16 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
Related: [-]