Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cv-00701
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:May 26, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:32 AM EST
Defendant
Emyode Services Conseils Inc.
Defendant
Wiseleap Solutions Inc.
Plaintiff
JCAI America Inc.
Represented By
Ahmed Jamal Davis
Fish & Richardson Pc (dc)
contact info
Plaintiff
JCAI Inc.
Represented By
Ahmed Jamal Davis
Fish & Richardson Pc (dc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/23 6:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JCAI Inc., JCAI America Inc. Emyode Services Conseils Inc. served on 8/23/2023, answer due 9/13/2023 (Davis, Ahmed)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/23 6:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JCAI Inc., JCAI America Inc. Wiseleap Solutions Inc. served on 8/21/2023, answer due 9/11/2023 (Davis, Ahmed)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 05/26 12:49 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, to Defendant Emyode Services Conseils Inc. by JCAI America Inc., JCAI Inc.. (Davis, Ahmed)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 05/26 12:48 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, to Defendant Wiseleap Solutions Inc. by JCAI America Inc., JCAI Inc.. (Davis, Ahmed)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/26 12:41 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8955103.), filed by JCAI Inc., JCAI America Inc..(Davis, Ahmed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action re Patent or Trademark Form AO120,
Att: 8 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer Fri 05/26 4:02 PM
Intradistrict Transfer to Richmond Division - Richmond case number 3:23cv350 (Khan, )
Related: [-]