California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-00931
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:May 02, 2024
Case in other court:California Superior Court - Orange County, 30-02023-01313966-CU-
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 4:10 AM PST
Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By
Julian M Feldbein-Vinderman
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Oliver M Gold
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
VBV Pro
Defendant
Does
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Allan Goodman
Represented By
Allan J. Goodman
Adr Services, Inc. C/o Allan Goodman
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Fransila
Represented By
Ian Matthew Silverthorne
Silverthorne Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 02, 2024
25 25 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 05/02 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
24 24 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Thu 10/12 7:34 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Allan Goodman has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
23 23 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Wed 10/11 5:52 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that the Hon. Allan J. Goodman Related [+] may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 2/16/2024 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC(Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-] t.
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
22 22 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Wed 09/20 9:57 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/15/2024. (kdu)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Wed 09/20 9:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. Discovery cut-off 6/10/2024. Motions due by 7/8/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2024 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Jury Trial set for 8/27/2024 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Wed 09/20 9:53 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge David O. Carter: The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Courts scheduling order to issue. APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff- Ian Matthew Silverthorne; For Defendant- Oliver Gold. Courtroom Deputy Clerk: Karlen Dubon, Court Reporter: Court Smart, Time in Court: 0:14. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Lodging Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Tue 09/19 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC.(Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling and Case Management Order
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 09/12 10:31 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2023 at 08:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter at Los Angeles First Street Courthouse, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012, Courtroom 10C. **TIME AND LOCATION CHANGE** THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
17 17 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 08/29 2:59 PM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (Los Angeles First Street) held before Judge David O. Carter. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court ORDERS expedited discovery. Depositions to be completed before September 18, 2023. Scheduling Conference continued to 9/18/2023 at 07:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Court Reporter: Court Smart. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
16 16 stip Protective Order Fri 08/25 3:43 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC.(Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 08/23 8:54 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. The Court ORDERS the parties to appear in Courtroom 10C, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, CA. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 08/14 2:56 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 Days, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC.. (Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 07/07 11:23 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 06/30 2:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC.(Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/28 2:09 PM
Notice to Plaintiff of Assignment to United States Judges and Issuance Of Initial Standing Order Following Assignment of Civil Case to Judge Carter filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 06/27 11:59 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 06/02 2:45 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com Services LLC answer now due 6/30/2023, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC.(Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 05/26 5:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC, re Declaration,3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on May 26, 2023. (Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 05/26 4:19 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 05/26 4:19 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 05/26 4:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/26 10:56 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 05/26 10:46 AM
DECLARATION of Julian Feldbein-Vinderman re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC.(Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Medical Bills for Justin Fransila - Redacted
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 05/26 10:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 05/26 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CA Superior Court - Orange County, case number 30-2023 01313966-CU-PL-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-35386100 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attorney Julian M Feldbein-Vinderman added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:dft))(Feldbein-Vinderman, Julian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit A- Orange County Superior Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Orange County Superior Court Register of Actions
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 05/26 4:06 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Amazon.com Services LLC, Does, VBV Pro., filed by Plaintiff Justin Fransila.[FILED IN STATE COURT 03/16/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]