Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:23-cv-00886
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:May 07, 2024
Case in other court:Allegheny County, GD-23-005903
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:25 AM EST
Defendant
ELITE LIGHTING
Represented By
Jacob C. McCrea
Jacob Mccrea Law, LLC
contact info
Mediator
MARK D. SHEPARD
Represented By
Mark D. Shepard
Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir
contact info
Mediator
Mark D. Shepard
Babst Calland 603 Stanwix St, 6th Fl Two Gateway Center
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
Mark D. Shepard
Babst, Calland, Clements & Zomnir
contact info
Plaintiff
REPCO II, INC.
Represented By
J. Alexander Hershey
Clark Hill PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
65 65 misc Satisfaction of Jgm - for Jgms entered after 7/1/05 Tue 02/18 4:59 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re59 Default Judgment entered In favor of REPCO II, INC. Against ELITE LIGHTING by REPCO II, INC.. (Hershey, J. Alexander)
Related: [-]