Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Lindsey R Vaala
Referred: Lindsey R Vaala
Case #: 1:23-cv-00702
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:Apr 22, 2024
Case in other court:Alexandria Circuit Court, CL23001397
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:32 AM EST
Cross Claimant
Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Allan Ranck
Schenker & Lopez
contact info
Cross Defendant
Knight Facilities Management, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin Thomas Owings, II
Hanover Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Knight Facilities Management, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin Thomas Owings, II
Hanover Law Office
contact info
Defendant
Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew Allan Ranck
Schenker & Lopez
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathifa Whittier
Represented By
Gregory Todd Hunter
Gregory T. Hunter, Esquire
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 22, 2024
26 26 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 04/22 2:36 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in favor of Defendants Knight Facilities Management, Inc. and Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc., and against Plaintiff Nathifa Whittier. Entered by Clerk on 4/22/2024. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
25 25 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Order Mon 04/22 2:19 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Defendant Transurban (USA) Operations, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 21) is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Defendant Knight Facilities Management's Motion for SummaryJudgment (Dkt. No. 22) is GRANTED (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 4/19/2024. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
24 24 3 pgs order Order Wed 03/13 3:40 PM
ORDERED that Defendant Knight Facilities Management, Inc. must refile a version of Exhibit 5 that redacts the personally identifying information prohibited from public disclosure under Fed. Rule Civ. P. 5.2-i.e., the sensitive information contained in Plaintiff's answer to Interrogatory No. 1. It is further ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Knight Facilities Management, Inc. must coordinate to immediately notify Plaintiff that her personal information has been publicly available since November 22, 2023, so that Plaintiff may take steps (e.g., by running credit checks, etc.) to determine whether the information has been inappropriately obtained and used by third parties (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 3/13/2024. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 7:52 AM
ORDERED that the Court considers both Motions for Summary Judgment to be unopposed and will decide the Motions on the papers. No oral argument will be heard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 1/4/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Wed 11/22 1:13 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Knight Facilities Management, Inc..(Owings, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Proposed Order
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Wed 11/22 11:45 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc..(Ranck, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/08 4:12 PM
The Court hereby adopts the following schedule for the filing of, and responses to, dispositive motions: Dispositive Motions to be filed by November 22, 2023 Responses to be filed by December 13, 2023 Reply Briefs to be filed by December 20, 2023 The final pretrial conference on November 15, 2023 is hereby canceled, and will be reset by the Court at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 11/8/2023. (nneb). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 11/8/2023. (nneb)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Pretrial Statement Wed 11/08 10:51 AM
Pretrial Statement (Exhibits and Witness Lists) by Knight Facilities Management, Inc.. (Owings, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/19 4:06 PM
ORDER that, to the extent this matter is not resolved, the parties are directed to file a joint statement by November 8, 2023, indicating whether the parties intend to file dispositive motions and, if so, setting forth a proposed briefing schedule for those motions. The parties should submit a proposed order setting forth their proposed briefing schedule with the joint statement (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 10/19/23. (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 10/18 11:51 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/2/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (per WEF chambers) (tfitz, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
17 17 answer Answer to Crossclaim Wed 10/11 4:34 PM
Knight Facilities ANSWER to Crossclaim , Knight Facilities ANSWER to Crossclaim Knight Facilities , ANSWER to Crossclaim by Knight Facilities Management, Inc..(Owings, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
16 16 cmp Crossclaim Thu 10/05 2:09 PM
CROSSCLAIM against Knight Facilities Management, Inc., CROSSCLAIM against Knight Facilities Management, Inc., filed by Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc..(Ranck, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
15 15 cmp Crossclaim Mon 10/02 12:54 PM
CROSSCLAIM against Knight Facilities Management, Inc., filed by Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc.(Dest)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 10/02 12:50 PM
ORDERED that Defendant Transurban's Motion (Dkt. No. 13) is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Transurban to file its proposed cross-claim against Defendant Knight Facilities is October 5, 2023; it is further ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3), Defendant Knight Facilities must answer or otherwise respond to Defendant Transurban's cross-claim within fourteen (14) days after it is filed (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 10/2/2023. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
misc Notice of Correction Fri 09/29 11:04 AM
Notice of Correction re13 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Cross Claim . Unfortunately, the document contains more than one pleading. (As a reminder, we request that filing users file a copy of the same document separately for each pleading or motion relief.) Please file the Supporting Memorandum again separately. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Thu 09/28 2:00 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Cross Claim by Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc..(Ranck, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, September 01, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/01 4:07 PM
DOCUMENT REMOVED (DUPLICATIVE ENTRY). (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/1/2023) (Dest)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/01 4:07 PM
Orders Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 09/01/2023. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines Fri 09/01 4:17 PM
***Deadlines terminated - Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles - TERMINATED per Order entered. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 09/01 4:23 PM
Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 11/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
10 10 misc Consent/Decline to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 08/22 4:24 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Knight Facilities Management, Inc.. (Owings, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Decline to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 08/22 4:08 PM
Plaintiff's Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Nathifa Whittier. (Hunter, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
8 8 misc Consent/Decline to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 08/16 2:20 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc.. (Ranck, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 6 pgs order Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order Wed 08/16 1:21 PM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Joint Discovery Plan is approved, as amended herein and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. The parties are directed to sign and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (Dkt. No. 4-2) by August 23,2023 (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 8/16/2023. (nneb)
Related: [-]
6 6 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 08/16 1:18 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/16/2023. Appearance of counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants. Discovery Plan approved. Consented to proceed before Magistrate Judge. Parties to file Magistrate Judge Consent Form. Order to issue. (Tape #FTR.)(nneb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/16/2023) (nneb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
5 5 misc Discovery Plan Wed 08/09 1:44 PM
Joint Discovery Plan Discovery Plan by Knight Facilities Management, Inc..(Owings, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
4 4 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/13 8:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles. Discovery due by 11/10/2023. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 07/12/13.(pmil, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice,
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
Monday, June 19, 2023
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/19 2:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc.. (Ranck, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 06/19 2:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Transurban (USA) Operation, Inc..(Ranck, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 05/26 2:41 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8955618.), filed by Knight Facilities Managment, Inc..(Owings, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit Answer
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 05/30 10:12 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (show)
Related: [-]