Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Roderick C Young
Referred: Mark R Colombell
Case #: 3:23-cv-00350
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:33 AM EST
Defendant
Emyode Services Conseils Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer Smith Jackman
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Robert Devin Keeler
Ice Miller Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
Lesley McCall Grossberg
Ice Miller Llp (pa-Na)
contact info
Kenneth Jon Sheeh
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wiseleap Solutions Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer Smith Jackman
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Robert Devin Keeler
Ice Miller Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
Lesley McCall Grossberg
Ice Miller Llp (pa-Na)
contact info
Kenneth Jon Sheeh
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JCAI America Inc.
Represented By
Ahmed Jamal Davis
Fish & Richardson Pc (dc)
contact info
Jeremy Saks
Fish & Richardson, P.C. (ny-Na)
contact info
Jason William Wolff
Fish & Richardson P. C. (ca-Na)
contact info
Plaintiff
JCAI Inc.
Represented By
Ahmed Jamal Davis
Fish & Richardson Pc (dc)
contact info
Jeremy Saks
Fish & Richardson, P.C. (ny-Na)
contact info
Jason William Wolff
Fish & Richardson P. C. (ca-Na)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 16, 2024
75 75 misc Letter Tue 09/17 12:25 PM
Letter from Ministere De La Justice re: translation of ECF72 Order.(jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unmarked Attachments,
Att: 2 Envelope