New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:23-cv-04433
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332pd Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:Apr 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:16 AM EST
ADR Provider
Travelers Commercial Insurance Company
Law Office of Eric D. Feldman 2 Corporate Center Drive
Melville, NY 11747
Counter Claimant
BOARD OF MANAGERS OF 25 PARK ROWCONDOMINIUM by its President LAURA ROG
Represented By
Christopher T. Cafaro
Montfort, Healy, Mcguire & Salley, LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
HALSTEAD MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
Christopher T. Cafaro
Montfort, Healy, Mcguire & Salley, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Rael Maintenance Corp.
Represented By
Anne Elizabeth Armstrong
Gartner And Bloom
contact info
Christopher Raymond Hemway
contact info
Cross Claimant
BOARD OF MANAGERS OF 25 PARK ROWCONDOMINIUM by its President LAURA ROG
Represented By
Christopher T. Cafaro
Montfort, Healy, Mcguire & Salley, LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
HALSTEAD MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
Christopher T. Cafaro
Montfort, Healy, Mcguire & Salley, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
L&M BUILDERS GROUP, LLC
Cross Defendant
WSP USA, Inc.
Cross Defendant
WSP USA Buildings, Inc.
Cross Defendant
Urban Atelier Group, LLC
Cross Defendant
RCI FIRE PROTECTION, LLC
Cross Defendant
PARKVIEW PLUMBING & HEATING, INC.
Cross Defendant
PARK ROW 23 OWNERS, LLC
Cross Defendant
L+M DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC
Cross Defendant
Cookfox Architects, D.P.C.
Cross Defendant
BURO HAPPOLD, INC.
Cross Defendant
Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C.
Cross Defendant
CHATSWORTH BUILDERS, LLC
Defendant
Rael Maintenance Corp.
Represented By
Anne Elizabeth Armstrong
Gartner And Bloom
contact info
Christopher Raymond Hemway
contact info
Plaintiff
Nationwide General Insurance Company as subrogee of Salil Sethi and Khushpreet Kaur and as subrogee of Jing Chen and Bo Zhu
Represented By
Robert William Phelan
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
HALSTEAD MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
Christopher T. Cafaro
Montfort, Healy, Mcguire & Salley, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
L+M DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
WSP USA, Inc.
ThirdParty Defendant
WSP USA Buildings, Inc.
ThirdParty Defendant
BOARD OF MANAGERS OF 25 PARK ROWCONDOMINIUM by its President LAURA ROG
Represented By
Christopher T. Cafaro
Montfort, Healy, Mcguire & Salley, LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Urban Atelier Group, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
BURO HAPPOLD, INC.
ThirdParty Defendant
Cookfox Architects, D.P.C.
250 West 57th Street
17th Floor, NY 10107
ThirdParty Defendant
Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C.
ThirdParty Defendant
RCI FIRE PROTECTION, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
L&M BUILDERS GROUP, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
PARKVIEW PLUMBING & HEATING, INC.
ThirdParty Defendant
CHATSWORTH BUILDERS, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
PARK ROW 23 OWNERS, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Rael Maintenance Corp.
Represented By
Anne Elizabeth Armstrong
Gartner And Bloom
contact info
Christopher Raymond Hemway
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 25, 2024
103 103 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 04/25 4:04 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:102 Memorandum Opinion & Order. in favor of Rael Maintenance Corp. against Nationwide General Insurance Company as subrogee of Salil Sethi and Khushpreet Kaur and as subrogee of Jing Chen and Bo Zhu.It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated April 24, 2024, Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED and Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed without prejudice; accordingly, the cases are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 4/25/2024) (nd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of right to appeal
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
102 102 21 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 04/25 11:00 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: (22 in 1:23-cv-05193-GHW) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Rael Maintenance Corp., (24 in 1:23-cv-04462-GHW) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Rael Maintenance Corp., (28 in 1:23-cv-04433-GHW) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Rael Maintenance Corp., (26 in 1:23-cv-08717-GHW) MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Rael Maintenance Corp.. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED and Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the following motions: Nationwide General Insurance Co. v. Rael Maintenance Corp., No. 1:23-cv-04433-GHW, Dkt. No. 28 The Cincinnati Insurance Co. v. Rael Maintenance Corp., No. 1:23-cv-4462-GHW, Dkt. No. 49 USAA Casualty Insurance Co. v. Rael Maintenance Corp., No. 1:23-cv-5193-GHW, Dkt. No. 52 Travelers Excess, & Surplus Lines Co. a/s/o Park Row 23 Owners LLC v. Rael Maintenance Corp., No. 1:23-cv-8717-GHW, Dkt. No. 47. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate all pending motions and close the case in the above-listed cases (Nos. 1:23-cv-4433-GHW, 1:23-cv-4462-GHW, 1:23-cv-5193-GHW, 1:23-cv-8717-GHW). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/24/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
101 101 answer Answer to Crossclaim Wed 04/24 1:49 PM
ANSWER to87 Crossclaim. Document filed by Buro Happold, Inc.,..(Fox, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]