Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Referred: John K Larkins, III
Case #: 1:23-cv-02343
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (other)
Case Filed:May 25, 2023
Terminated:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2023 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
Preferred Personnel Solutions
Represented By
JonVieve Hill
Fisher & Phillips Llp-Atl
contact info
Tillman Y. Coffey
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr.
1053 Holcombe Rd Apt. J
Decatur, GA 30032
Represented By
Ianna O. Richardson
Barrett & Farahany
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
20 20 misc Judgment - Clerk Tue 01/23 2:01 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (tht)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Tue 01/23 1:42 PM
ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, Dkt. No.16 , as its opinion: this case is DISMISSED in accordance with Local Rule 41.3 for want of prosecution and failure to obey a lawful Order of the Court. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 01/23/2024. (tht)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 01/23 10:33 AM
Submission of16 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/23 1:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (tht)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 01/23 2:03 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. re19 Order and20 Clerk's Judgment. (tht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 12/19 4:04 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. re18 Order. (tht)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 12/18 10:02 AM
ORDER granting Oral Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have through January 16, 2024, to file an objection to the Final Report and Recommendation, Dkt.16 and a response to Defendants motion for summary judgment, Dkt12 . Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 12/18/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
motion Extension of Time Mon 12/18 10:00 AM
Oral MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to defendant's motion for summary judgment, Dkt. No.12 , and an objection to Report and Recommendation, Dkt. No.16 by JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. (tht)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
17 17 3 pgs order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Mon 12/04 1:23 PM
ORDER for Service of16 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/04/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Mon 12/04 1:20 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Because Plaintiff has refused to comply with three orders of the Court, and appears uninterested in prosecuting this lawsuit, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action be DISMISSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 12/04/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/04 1:24 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. re16 Final R&R and17 Order for Service. (tht)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/27 10:22 AM
Submission of15 Order to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 11/08 10:21 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to notify the Clerk whether he has hired a new lawyer or will proceed without a lawyer no later than, Wednesday, November 22, 2023. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit the matter to the undersigned after expiration of the above time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/08/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 11/08 9:15 AM
Submission of14 Order to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (bnp)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/08 10:22 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. re15 Order. (tht)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
14 14 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Fri 10/20 2:40 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to notify the Clerk whether he has hired a new lawyer or will proceed without a lawyer no later than, Friday, November 3, 2023. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit the matter to the undersigned after expiration of the above time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 10/20/23. (ces)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 10/20 8:52 AM
Submission of13 Order to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (bnp)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/20 2:41 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. re14 Order. (ces)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/02 8:10 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. re13 Order. (tht)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
13 13 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Mon 10/02 8:06 AM
ORDER: The undersigned DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to send this order, and future orders, to Plaintiff at his updated address, 1053 Holcombe Rd., Apt. J, Decatur, Ga. 30032. It is further ORDERED that no later than October 13, 2023, Plaintiff must notify the Clerk of Court whether he has hired a new lawyer or will proceed without a lawyer. Defendant is DIRECTED to send its summary judgment motion to Plaintiff at the updated address. Plaintiff must file a response to the motion no later than twenty-one (21) days after Defendant re-serves the summary judgment motion at the updated address. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 09/29/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Thu 09/28 2:52 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Preferred Personnel Solutions.(Hill, JonVieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Stamey Affid.,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Brekke Decl.,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Jun 27 Corresp.,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Aug 10 Corresp.
Thursday, September 21, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/21 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tillman Y. Coffey on behalf of Preferred Personnel Solutions (Coffey, Tillman)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time Wed 09/20 11:38 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re:1 Complaint, by Preferred Personnel Solutions.(Hill, JonVieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 09/20 12:27 PM
ORDER by docket entry only granting9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's answer or other response is due 9/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 09/20/2023. (lg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
10 10 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/20 2:58 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. re8 Order (jra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/03 3:07 PM
ORDER: Ms. Richardson's motion6 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is reminded of her obligations upon withdrawal of counsel: When an attorney withdraws or otherwise is removed as counsel of record, the party whom the attorney was representing must notify the clerk within 21 days or before any further proceedings are conducted of the retention of another attorney or of the partys decision to proceed pro se. The party also must provide the clerk with the current telephone number, address, and email address of the replacement attorney or of the party, if proceeding pro se. Failure to comply with this rule will constitute a default by the party. L.R. 83.1E(5), NDGa.In other words, Plaintiff has twenty-one (21) days from service of this order to notify the Clerk of this Court whether he has hired a new lawyer or will proceed without a lawyer. L.R. 83.1E(5), NDGa. If Plaintiff chooses to proceed without a lawyer, he must keep the Court notified of his current address. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this case. Additionally, for good cause shown, Defendant's motion for extension of time is GRANTED7 . Defendant's answer or other response is due September 21, 2023. (Personnel Solutions Answer due 9/21/2023) Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/3/2023. (jra)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Thu 08/03 9:03 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Preferred Personnel Solutions.(Hill, JonVieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 08/03 3:56 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 8/3/2023 in8 Order. (jra)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/03 3:58 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. re Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney NEF &8 Order (jra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
6 6 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 07/25 12:10 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Ianna O. Richardson as Attorneyby JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr.(Richardson, Ianna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Withdraw
Monday, June 26, 2023
5 5 misc Leave of Absence Mon 06/26 5:35 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 9/4/23,9/5/23,9/6/23,9/7/23,9/8/23,9/9/23, by Ianna O. Richardson. (Richardson, Ianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 06/09 5:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. Preferred Personnel Solutions waiver mailed on 6/8/2023, answer due 8/7/2023. (Richardson, Ianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Fri 05/26 10:31 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 5/26/2023. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 05/26 10:24 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Preferred Personnel Solutions. (dnb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/26 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by JaQuan A. Robinson, Sr. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12625803)(dnb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/26 3:02 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. (jra)
Related: [-]