Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Paul S Diamond
Case #: 2:23-cv-02041
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 26, 2023
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:26 AM EST
Defendant
BISK EDUCATION, INC.
Represented By
DAVID HAYES
Turkel Cava Barrios PA
contact info
BRUCE P. MERENSTEIN
Welsh & Recker, P.C.
contact info
RICHARD D. WALK, III
Welsh And Recker, P.C.
contact info
SAMUEL W. SILVER
Welsh & Recker, P.C.
contact info
KENNETH TURKEL
Turkel Cava Barrios P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY
Represented By
DANIEL J. BOLAND
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info
MICHAEL E. BAUGHMAN
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 01, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Fri 03/01 11:42 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/1/24. 3/1/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
33 33 15 pgs order Order Wed 02/14 11:33 AM
STIPULATED ESI DISCOVERY PROTOCOL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 2/14/24. 2/14/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation Thu 02/08 5:25 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order by VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY. (BOLAND, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
31 31 17 pgs order Order Fri 01/26 11:29 AM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALTY ORDER AND AGREEMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/26/24. 1/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
30 30 minutes Docket Call 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/26 9:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMONDCase Management Conference held on 1/25/24. (rf, )
Related: [-]
29 29 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 01/26 7:52 AM
ORDER THAT MOTIONS DUE BY 6/11/2024., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 8/8/2024., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 6/11/2024., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/28/2024 11:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/8/2024., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/8/2024., TRIAL DATE SET FOR 9/3/2024 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 14A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/25/24. 1/25/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
28 28 misc Stipulation Thu 01/18 10:26 AM
STIPULATION Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Proposed Protective Order by VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY. (BOLAND, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
27 27 misc Status Report Wed 01/17 3:05 PM
STATUS REPORT (Amended Rule 26(f) Joint) by VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY. (BOLAND, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 01/05 10:03 AM
ORDER THAT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/25/2024 02:00 PM IN Judge's Chambers. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 1/5/24. 1/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
25 25 21 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/15 10:25 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by BISK EDUCATION, INC..(SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
24 24 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 10/25 12:36 PM
ORDER denying17 MOTION TO DISMISS. ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DUE NO LATER THAN 11/15/23. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/25/23.10/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Discovery Wed 10/25 12:09 PM
ORDER granting21 MOTION FOR DISCOVERY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/25/23.10/25/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
22 22 misc Proposed Order Fri 10/20 11:48 AM
Proposed Pretrial Order Re: Motion to Facilitate Discovery by BISK EDUCATION, INC.. (SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Discovery Fri 10/20 11:44 AM
Joint MOTION for Discovery Facilitation filed by BISK EDUCATION, INC...(SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
20 20 misc Letter Tue 09/12 12:51 PM
Letter to the Honorable Paul S. Diamond from Daniel Boland (rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 08/17 4:12 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by BISK EDUCATION, INC.. (SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
18 18 30+ pgs respm Memorandum Mon 08/14 3:13 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Bisk Education, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue re17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY.(BOLAND, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -Declaration of Kristy Irwin In Support
Monday, July 31, 2023
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 07/31 6:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by BISK EDUCATION, INC..Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael Bisk,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 17, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 07/17 12:29 PM
ORDER granting14 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/17/23.7/17/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 07/17 12:26 PM
ORDER granting13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/17/23.7/17/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 06/22 4:17 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David Hayes, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16769782.) filed by BISK EDUCATION, INC..Certificate of Service.(SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 06/22 4:15 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kenneth Turkel, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-16769731.) filed by BISK EDUCATION, INC..Certificate of Service.(SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
12 12 misc Status Report Fri 06/16 4:26 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY. (BOLAND, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Disclosure of Citizenship Fri 06/16 4:10 PM
Disclosure of Citizenship in Diversity Cases by BISK EDUCATION, INC. . (SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Fri 06/16 4:08 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by BISK EDUCATION, INC..(SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/16 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD D. WALK, III on behalf of BISK EDUCATION, INC. with certificate of service(WALK, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/16 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL W. SILVER on behalf of BISK EDUCATION, INC. with certificate of service(SILVER, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/16 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE P. MERENSTEIN on behalf of BISK EDUCATION, INC. with certificate of service(MERENSTEIN, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/15 10:03 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY. BISK EDUCATION, INC. waiver sent on 5/31/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. (BOLAND, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/08 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL E. BAUGHMAN on behalf of VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY with Certificate of Service(BAUGHMAN, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
4 4 9 pgs order Order Fri 06/02 12:15 PM
STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/2/2023. 6/2/2023 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
3 3 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Tue 05/30 5:18 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY.(BOLAND, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/30 10:03 AM
Summons Issued as to BISK EDUCATION, INC.. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 05/26 6:56 PM
COMPLAINT against BISK EDUCATION, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16718131.), filed by VILLANOVA UNIVERSITY.(BOLAND, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form