McManus v. United States Of America
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00671 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:31 AM EST |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judd McManus
4301 Columbia Pike Apt 703
Arlington, VA 22204 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/22 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr on behalf of United States of America (Barghaan, Dennis) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Opposition
Wed 02/14 11:43 AM
Opposition to17 MOTION,18 Memorandum for Injunction filed by United States of America. (Wetzler, Lauren) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
respoth
Memorandum
Tue 02/06 12:56 PM
Argument in re17 MOTION for Injunction filed by Judd McManus (Sbro) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Tue 02/06 12:41 PM
MOTION for Injunction filed by Judd McManus. (Sbro) (Sbro) |
|
Att: 1 (2/6/2024) Envelope | ||
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
14
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion Order
Thu 02/01 3:58 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 5) is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Counts I-VII are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as barred by the doctrine of collateral estoppel; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Count VIII is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (See Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 2/1/2024. (Sbro) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 11/17 1:26 PM
Addendum to Reply Memorandum in re14 Reply Memorandum re [Dkt. no. 13] Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Judd McManus.(Dest) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
utility
1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/07 10:07 AM
*** Motion Hearing deadline terminated - Per RDA's chambers motions set for 9/13/2023 will be decided on the papers; no oral argument will be heard (tarm) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Reply Other
Tue 08/29 12:34 PM
Reply Memorandum to13 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Judd McManus. (nneb) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/15 1:02 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by United States of America.(Wetzler, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/15 2:17 PM
Set Deadline as to8 10 MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (wgar, ) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 08/15 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion in re8 MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss,10 MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (nneb) |
|
11 | 11
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Tue 08/15 11:11 AM
Memorandum in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Judd McManus.(nneb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibtis 1 through 4, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Tue 08/15 11:10 AM
MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Judd McManus.(nneb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Wed 08/09 12:15 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro filed by Judd McManus.(pmil, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Wed 08/09 12:13 PM
MOTION in Opposition to Defendant's5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro by Judd McManus.(pmil, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/25 12:39 PM
Set Deadline as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (wgar, ) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Mon 07/24 10:13 AM
Notice of Hearing Date set for 9/13/23 re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.,6 Memorandum, (Wetzler, Lauren) |
|
6 | 6
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum
Mon 07/24 10:12 AM
Memorandum to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by United States of America.(Wetzler, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 07/24 10:09 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,., MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by United States of America.(Wetzler, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Roseboro Notice | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/24 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Wetzler on behalf of United States of America (Wetzler, Lauren) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 06/01 4:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney served on 5/25/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. Attorney General served on 5/26/2023.(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 05/26 9:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States and U.S. Attorney to be served by certified mail. (show) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/26 9:02 AM
COMPLAINT against United States Of America, filed by Judd McManus. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 100002316.)(show) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Receipt |