Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00697
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:May 25, 2023
Terminated:Dec 04, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2023 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
The United States Of America
Represented By
Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony J. Crews
P.O. Box 320033
Alexandria, VA 22320


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, December 04, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/04 3:25 PM
ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 8) is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint (Dkt. 1) is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/4/2023. (see order for details) (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
11 11 misc Roseboro Notice Tue 10/31 10:56 AM
Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss by The United States Of America (Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Waiver of Tue 10/31 10:54 AM
Waiver of re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Oral Argument) by The United States Of America (Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
9 9 10 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 10/31 10:49 AM
Memorandum in Support re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The United States Of America.(Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 10/31 10:46 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The United States Of America. (Barghaan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 09/11 2:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. The US Attorney served on 9/8/2023, answer due 11/7/2023. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 07/18 4:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Attorney General served on 07/11/2023. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
5 5 notice Notice (other) Mon 06/26 11:11 AM
USMS 285 forms re4 Summons Issued as to USA. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 06/21 11:21 AM
Summons Issued, via USMS, as to The United States Of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
3 3 order Sealed Order Wed 05/31 8:53 AM
Sealed ORDER conditionally granting motion to proceed without prepaying fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 05/30/2023. (see order for details)(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/26 10:25 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony J. Crews. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/26 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT against The United States Of America, filed by Anthony J. Crews.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Complaint,
Att: 2 Letter