Maine District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00049
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2023 3:45 AM EDT
Defendant
TYLER CAMPBELL (1)
Represented By
RANDALL J. BATES
Bates Law Firm
contact info
GRAINNE DUNNE
Hallett, Whipple & Weyrens, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
LINDSAY FEINBERG
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/05/2024 1:06 AM EST
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
Arrest of TYLER CAMPBELL (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney GRAINNE DUNNE for TYLER CAMPBELL. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF on 04/27/2023. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs COMPLAINT as to TYLER CAMPBELL (1). (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Affidavit of Daniel Donovan
2 2 2 pgs SYNOPSIS as to TYLER CAMPBELL (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Issued by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF as to TYLER CAMPBELL. Warrant provided to U.S. Marshals Service. (nrg) Modified on 4/27/2023 to unseal (nrg). [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF HEARING as to TYLER CAMPBELL: Initial Appearance and Attorney Appointment set for 4/27/2023 11:30 AM in Portland Hearing Room before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Detention by USA as to TYLER CAMPBELL Responses due by 5/18/2023. (FEINBERG, LINDSAY) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF:Initial Appearance held as to TYLER CAMPBELL. After court inquiry, the record reflects the defendant was arrested on 04/26/2023., Attorney Appointment Hearing held. Grainne Dunne appointed as to TYLER CAMPBELL. Defendant ordered temporarily detained, and remanded to the U.S. Marshals Service. (Court Reporter: Tammy Martell) (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
7 7 Financial Affidavit by TYLER CAMPBELL (Access to document is restricted to USA and applicable defendant only) (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
8 8 Oral ORDER approving7 Financial Affidavit as to TYLER CAMPBELL (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to TYLER CAMPBELL: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to TYLER CAMPBELL By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF HEARING as to TYLER CAMPBELL: Preliminary Exam and Detention Hearing set for 5/2/2023 02:30 PM in Portland Hearing Room before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
12 12 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and Hearing on Government's Motion for Detention by TYLER CAMPBELL Responses due by 5/22/2023. (DUNNE, GRAINNE) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
13 13 ORDER granting12 Motion to Continue Preliminary Exam and Detention Hearing as to TYLER CAMPBELL (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING as to TYLER CAMPBELL: Preliminary Exam and Detention Hearing reset for 5/5/2023 12:15 PM in Portland Hearing Room before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
15 15 Pretrial Services Report as to TYLER CAMPBELL filed by U.S. Probation. (Access to document is restricted to USA and applicable defendant only)(ELWORTHY, MELISSA) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement AO199
Friday, May 05, 2023
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF:Preliminary Hearing Waived as to TYLER CAMPBELL, Detention Hearing Waived as to TYLER CAMPBELL. Defendant consented to detention. (Court Reporter: FTR) (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by TYLER CAMPBELL (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to TYLER CAMPBELL By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
19 19 5 pgs MOTION to Reopen Detention Hearing , MOTION for Bond ( Responses due by 6/7/2023.) by TYLER CAMPBELL (DUNNE, GRAINNE) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER granting19 Motion to Reopen Detention Hearing as to TYLER CAMPBELL (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
21 21 NOTICE OF HEARING as to TYLER CAMPBELL: Reopen Detention Hearing set for 5/22/2023 01:00 PM in Portland Hearing Room before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
22 22 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING as to TYLER CAMPBELL Re-open Detention Hearing set for 5/19/2023 01:30 PM in Portland Hearing Room before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
23 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF:Hearing held as to TYLER CAMPBELL. Defense counsel alerted the court of a conflict. Re-open detention hearing to be rescheduled to a later date. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
24 24 ORAL MOTION by Grainne Dunne to Withdraw as Attorney by TYLER CAMPBELL (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORAL ORDER re: 24 Oral Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to TYLER CAMPBELL. Defense counsel to follow up with written motion to withdraw. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (lcb) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs MOTION by Grainne Dunne to Withdraw as Attorney by TYLER CAMPBELL Responses due by 6/9/2023. (DUNNE, GRAINNE) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
27 27 ORDER granting 24 Oral Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to TYLER CAMPBELL (1); granting26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to TYLER CAMPBELL (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney RANDALL J. BATES for TYLER CAMPBELL. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF on 5/23/2023. (nrg) [2:23-mj-00101-KFW]
Related: [-]
(Access to document is restricted to case participants and public terminal) Unredacted Document Containing Jury Foreperson Signature re:28 Indictment as to TYLER CAMPBELL (lrt)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to TYLER CAMPBELL (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (lrt)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs SYNOPSIS as to TYLER CAMPBELL (lrt)
Related: [-]