New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-04258
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2023 3:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Peter Hardie (1)
Represented By
Zawadi S Baharanyi
Federal Defenders Of New York
contact info
Defendant
Dajhaan Perez (2)
Represented By
Michael Low Bloch
Bloch & White LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew J. King
Us Attorney'S Office, Southern District Of New York
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/18/2023 5:26 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
Arrest of Peter Hardie, Dajhaan Perez. (vb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
Set/Reset Hearings as to Peter Hardie: Preliminary Hearing set for 6/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Unassigned. (vb)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to Dajhaan Perez: Preliminary Hearing set for 6/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Unassigned. (vb)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT as to Peter Hardie, Dajhaan Perez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein) (vb)
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Peter Hardie. Attorney Zawadi Baharanyi is appointed as counsel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein) (vb)
Related: [-]
3 3 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dajhaan Perez. Attorney Michael Bloch is appointed as counsel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein) (vb)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein:Initial Appearance as to Peter Hardie held on 5/24/2023. Defendant Peter Hardie present with attorney Zawadi Baharanyi. Matthew King is present for the Government. Defendant is ordered detained on consent without prejudice. Preliminary hearing date set for 6/23/23. (vb) (vb).
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein:Initial Appearance as to Dajhaan Perez held on 5/24/2023. Defendant Dajhaan Perez present with attorney Michael Bloch. Matthew king present for the government. Defendant is ordered Detained on consent without prejudice. Preliminary hearing date set for 6/23/23. (vb)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER FOR INITIAL MEDICAL EVALUATION as to Peter Hardie. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/24/23)(vb)
Related: [-]