Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:23-cv-00703
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Terminated:Jul 11, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 5:39 AM EST
Defendant
Jedidah Hussey
in her official capacity as Director, Arlington Asylum Office Arlington Asylum Office 1525 Wilson Blvd., Ste. 300
Arlington, VA 22209
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Washington, DC 20001
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Washington, DC 20528
Plaintiff
Rahatullah Doust
5520 54th Ave Apt. 2
Riverdale, MD 20737
Represented By
John Steven Bolesta
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Ryan Jennifer Munitz
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
9 9 order So Ordered Tue 07/11 5:33 PM
So Ordered in re8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Petition for Writ of Mandamus without Prejudice . Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/11/2023. (Dest)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/11 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Rahatullah Doust (Munitz, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/20 1:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Exhs. 1-6 served on M. Garland-USAG; A. Mayorkas, Secretary DOHS; and U. Jaddou, Director USCIS on June 7 and June 12, 2023, filed by Rahatullah Doust.(Munitz, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/06 1:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Exhs. 1-6 served on J. Aber - U.S. Attorney - EDVA and J. Hussey - Dir. Arlington Asylum Office on June 2, 2023, filed by Rahatullah Doust.(Munitz, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 05/31 3:21 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed John Steven Bolesta for Rahatullah Doust. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/31/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 05/31 9:44 AM
Summons Issued as to Jedidah Hussey, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Notice
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/30 3:12 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Steven Bolesta and Certification of Local Counsel Ryan J. Munitz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8958074. by Rahatullah Doust. (Munitz, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 05/30 2:03 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, for Writ of Mandamus by Rahatullah Doust.(Munitz, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/30 1:55 PM
Complaint for Writ of Mandamus ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8957778.), filed by Rahatullah Doust.(Munitz, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 05/31 9:45 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (swil)
Related: [-]