Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:Jason A Robertson
Case #: 6:23-cv-00176
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 3:31 AM CST
Defendant
Southridge Apartments, Inc.
an Oklahoma domestic for-profit corporation P.O. Box 448
Kingfisher, OK 73750
Represented By
Carson Glass Lamle
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (okc)
contact info
Tami J. Hines
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (okc)
contact info
Defendant
Wilburton Village, L.P.
Represented By
Carson Glass Lamle
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (okc)
contact info
Tami J. Hines
Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (okc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisa Nicole Robinson
Represented By
Alyssa J. Bryant
Legal Aid Services Of Oklahoma - Tulsa
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
48 48 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/17 9:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Lisa Nicole Robinson (Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
47 47 minutes 32 - Settlement Conference Held Tue 05/21 2:22 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow: Settlement Conference held on 5/21/2024 before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. Plaintiff was present and represented by counsel Alyssa Bryant. Defendant s Wilburton Village, L.P. and Southridge Apts, Inc. were present though Dana Holt and represented by counsel Carson Glass Lamle and Seth Day. Conference concluded WITHOUT settlement. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
46 46 order Ruling on Motion for Protective Order Mon 05/20 3:33 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson granting45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P.. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
45 45 motion Protective Order Mon 05/20 2:05 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. Responses due by 6/3/2024(Day, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
44 44 order 05 - Scheduling Order Wed 05/08 11:43 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson setting scheduling order date(s): Discovery due by 8/2/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/2024. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 11/15/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/15/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2024 at 1:30 PM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2024 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
43 43 order Ruling on Motion to Extend Deadline(s) Wed 05/08 11:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines (Docket No.42 ) is GRANTED. The Court will enter a First Amended Scheduling Order. (Robertson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
42 42 motion Extend Deadline(s) Tue 05/07 10:19 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline(s) Joint Application for Extension of the Deadline to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadline by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. Responses due by 5/21/2024(Day, Seth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
41 41 order Ruling on Motion to Appear Thu 05/02 4:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow granting40 Unopposed Motion for Leave from the Requirements to have their Insurance Representative Present at the Settlement Conference. A representative of Tokio Marine HCC must be immediately available via telephone for the duration of the settlement conference. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Appear Thu 05/02 2:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION Motion for Leave from the Requirements to have their Insurance Representative Present at the Settlement Conference by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. Responses due by 5/16/2024(Day, Seth) Modified on 5/2/2024 (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
39 39 trial Witness List Wed 04/17 3:41 PM
Final WITNESS LIST by Lisa Nicole Robinson (Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
38 38 trial Exhibit List Wed 04/17 3:36 PM
Final EXHIBIT LIST by Lisa Nicole Robinson (Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
37 37 trial Exhibit List Wed 04/17 2:48 PM
Final WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. (Day, Seth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
36 36 order Ruling on Motion to Extend Deadline(s) Wed 03/20 3:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange and File Witness and Exhibit Lists (Docket Entry35 ) is hereby GRANTED. The parties shall exchange, and file final witness and exhibit lists no later than APRIL 17, 2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Extend Deadline(s) Wed 03/20 10:04 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline(s) for Extension of Time to Exchange and File Final Witness and Exhibit List by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. Responses due by 4/3/2024(Day, Seth)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
34 34 misc Status Report Mon 02/26 10:35 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. (Lamle, Carson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
33 33 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/10 10:31 AM
ANSWER to Complaint Related [+] by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. (Lamle, Carson)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
32 32 order Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Wed 12/27 2:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Based upon the record made at the hearing conducted December 27, 2023, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry18 ) is hereby DENIED. Defendants' Answers are due on or before January 10, 2024. (jpc, Deputy Clerk) Modified text on 12/27/2023 (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
31 31 minutes 22 - Motion Hearing Held Wed 12/27 11:00 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Motion Hearing held on 12/27/2023 - Related [+] (Court Reporter: Karla McWhorter). (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 18 MOTION to Dismiss
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
30 30 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 12/13 9:07 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Seth A. Day on behalf of Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. (Day, Seth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
29 29 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset All Motion and R&R Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Tue 12/12 1:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: This Court will conduct an in person hearing to receive argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry18 ) on DECEMBER 27, 2023 AT 9:30 A.M. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
28 28 trial Witness List Tue 10/31 6:32 PM
Preliminary WITNESS LIST by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. (Hines, Tami)
Related: [-]
27 27 trial Exhibit List Tue 10/31 3:24 PM
Preliminary EXHIBIT LIST by Lisa Nicole Robinson (Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
26 26 trial Witness List Tue 10/31 3:21 PM
Preliminary WITNESS LIST by Lisa Nicole Robinson (Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
25 25 order 13 - Settlement Conference Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Thu 10/05 12:23 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Settlement Conference set for 5/21/2024 at 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 201, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow. Settlement conference Statements due 5/7/2024. (tmb, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
24 24 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Wed 09/27 11:53 AM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. (Hines, Tami)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
23 23 order 05 - Scheduling Order Fri 09/15 8:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson setting scheduling order date(s): Joinder of Parties due by 9/29/2023. Status Report due by 2/2/2024. Exhibit List due by 3/22/2024. Witness List due by 3/22/2024. Discovery due by 5/17/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2024. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 8/30/2024. Pretrial Order due by 8/30/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Jury Trial set for 9/23/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/11 3:50 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Related [+] by Lisa Nicole Robinson ; (With attachments)(Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-] 18 MOTION to Dismiss
Friday, September 01, 2023
21 21 misc Supplement Fri 09/01 11:06 AM
SUPPLEMENT Related [+] by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. (With attachments)(Hines, Tami)
Related: [-] 18 MOTION to Dismiss
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
20 20 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Wed 08/30 2:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: The parties have expressly indicated in the Joint Status Report (Docket Entry No.19 ) signed by all counsel of record in this case that they wish to consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1). As a result, this case is deemed CONSENTED TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE without the necessity for the filing or submission of any other documentation. The United States Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over this case through and including trial and the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(a). Additionally, the parties have indicated that they do not request a Scheduling Conference and have provided dates for the preparation of a Scheduling Order. As a result, the in person Scheduling Conference currently set for September 13, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby STRICKEN. A Scheduling Order will follow. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 Wed 08/30 10:17 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Lisa Nicole Robinson (Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
18 18 motion Dismiss Mon 08/28 2:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. Responses due by 9/11/2023(Hines, Tami)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
17 17 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Wed 08/23 2:13 PM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Lisa Nicole Robinson (Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
16 16 minutes 34 - Status Hearing Held Tue 08/22 8:38 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: Zoom Status Hearing held on 8/21/2023. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 08/21 10:38 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Carson Glass Lamle on behalf of Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. (Lamle, Carson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
14 14 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Tue 08/15 2:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson: The Court will conduct a video Status Conference in this case on AUGUST 21, 2023 AT 2:00 P.M. with counsel of record. Counsel will be e-mailed the Zoom video link on the day of the Conference. (jpc, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
13 13 order 01 - Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Tue 07/11 4:09 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
12 12 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Mon 07/10 12:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of District Judge John F. Heil, III, and at the direction of the Court, this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jason A. Robertson. District Judge John F. Heil, III no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-23-176-JAR. (ndd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Case - Recuse Judge Mon 07/10 9:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson and at the direction of the Court, this case is hereby reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-23-176-JFH. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 07/07 10:39 AM
WAIVER of Service of Summons returned executed. Southridge Apartments, Inc. received waiver on 6/27/2023, answer due 8/28/2023; Wilburton Village, L.P. received waiver on 6/27/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. Waiver filed by Southridge Apartments, Inc.; Wilburton Village, L.P. (Hines, Tami)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 07/07 10:13 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tami J. Hines on behalf of Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. (Hines, Tami)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
8 8 order Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Mon 06/05 9:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Jackson granting5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (pmb, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
7 7 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 05/31 10:03 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alyssa J. Bryant on behalf of Lisa Nicole Robinson (Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (FRCvP 7.1) Wed 05/31 9:58 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lisa Nicole Robinson (Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Proceed in Forma Pauperis Wed 05/31 9:46 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Lisa Nicole Robinson Responses due by 6/14/2023(Bryant, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
4 4 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Parties to File Disclosure Statements Tue 05/30 11:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - New CV Case Fee Payment Tue 05/30 11:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 6/6/2023) Related [+] (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 05/30 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Southridge Apartments, Inc., Wilburton Village, L.P. by Lisa Nicole Robinson. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/30 11:10 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lisa Nicole Robinson. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]