Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Elizabeth W Hanes
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 2:23-cv-00233
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Terminated:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 5:39 AM EST
Defendant
Elevance Health, Inc.
Represented By
David Edward Constine, III
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Andrew Henson
Troutman Pepper
contact info
Plaintiff
Lexus Haith
Represented By
Todd Michael Gaynor
Gaynor Law Center PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/14 3:39 PM
FINAL ORDER: The Court acknowledges that the dismissal is WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close the case. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 2/14/24. (mrees)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/13 10:11 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lexus Haith. (Gaynor, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
notice Notice (other) Wed 01/31 9:44 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The court has been advised that this matter is settled. At the direction of the court, we must notify you that the matter will be dismissed with prejudice unless an otherwise appropriate dismissal order is submitted by counsel within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this notice. This deadline may be extended only by an order of court obtained by counsel.If this matter requires court approval of the settlement, you should arrange an appropriate date for a hearing on settlement approval with the assigned judges calendar clerk. The court appreciates your giving this matter your prompt attention. (mrees)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Tue 01/30 9:05 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Lexus Haith (Gaynor, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
17 17 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 01/09 10:21 AM
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/9/24. (mrees)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
16 16 motion Protective Order Mon 01/08 11:10 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Elevance Health, Inc..(Constine, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Mon 01/08 1:00 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Krask.16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (mrees)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
15 15 4 pgs order Settlement Conference Order Wed 12/20 2:33 PM
Settlement Conference Order: Settlement Conference scheduled for February 14, 2024, at 1:30pm; Memorandum due by noon on February 7, 2024. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 12/20/23. (mrees)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 12/20 8:37 AM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/14/2024 at 01:30 PM in Norfolk Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (btit)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 12/13 1:47 PM
ORDER: With respect to Elevance's November 29, 2023, requests for production of documents, and Plaintiff's December 5, 2023, requests for production of documents, the date by which Plaintiff and Elevance must serve privilege logs shall be extended up to and including January 4,2024.Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 12/13/2023. (afar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
13 13 4 pgs motion Extension of Tue 12/12 3:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension to Serve Privilege Logs by Elevance Health, Inc..(Henson, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 16, 2023
12 12 13 pgs order Order Thu 11/16 3:47 PM
Scheduling and Pretrial Order. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 11/16/2023. (kgall)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 11/16 10:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/16/2023. Appearances of counsel via zoom. Counsel answer questions of the Court. The Court directs the parties to contact magistrate judge for purposes of a settlement conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 5 before District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. Jury Trial set for 6/24/2024 (approx 3 days) at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 5 before District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. Order to follow. (kgall)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 10/12 1:27 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 10:30 AM in Norfolk Remote before District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes.Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 10/12/2023. (kgall)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/06 8:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Henson on behalf of Elevance Health, Inc. (Henson, Andrew)
Related: [-]
misc Refer for 16 b Fri 10/06 10:55 AM
Refer for 16(b) (mrees)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/05 4:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Elevance Health, Inc..(Constine, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 09/08 10:57 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. It is hereby ORDERED that the time for Elevance Health, Inc., to respond or otherwise plead to the allegations in the Complaint is hereby enlarged until October 6, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 9/8/23. (mrees)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
6 6 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 09/07 3:16 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Elevance Health, Inc.. (Constine, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Thu 09/07 3:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time-Unopposed by Elevance Health, Inc..(Constine, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Thu 09/07 4:19 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Krask.5 MOTION for Extension of Time-Unopposed (mrees)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Mon 08/28 2:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Katie Bush on 08/25/2023, filed by Lexus Haith. (Gaynor, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/22 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Elevance Health, Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(mrees)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedure
Monday, August 21, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 08/21 3:22 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Lexus Haith. (Gaynor, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/30 3:54 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8958210.), filed by Lexus Haith.(Gaynor, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 05/30 4:55 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
Related: [-]