Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:23-cv-00606
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause38:4301 Right to Reemployment of Inducted Persons
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 3:37 AM CST
Defendant
JTC USA Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Barry A. Moscowitz
Thompson, Coe, Cousins & Irons, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trevor A Arnold
Represented By
Nathan E. Inurria
Ross Scalise Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Daniel B. Ross
The Ross Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
31 31 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 05/13 4:59 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by JTC USA Holdings Inc., re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant JTC USA Holdings Inc.(Malone, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Lauren McElhaney deposition,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Joanie Creger deposition
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 05/06 4:29 PM
Text Order GRANTING30 Motion for Extension of Time to File. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgement is hereby extended to May 13, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kklc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 05/05 1:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by JTC USA Holdings Inc.. (Malone, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
29 29 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/29 7:41 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Trevor A Arnold, re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant JTC USA Holdings Inc.(Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/23 11:05 AM
Text Order GRANTING28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS THEREFORE ordered that the deadline for Plaintiffs response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgement is extended to April 29, 2025. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kklc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/22 3:34 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to27 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Trevor A Arnold. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
27 27 motion Summary Judgment Tue 04/08 10:21 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by JTC USA Holdings Inc..(Malone, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O
Monday, January 27, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 01/27 11:59 AM
ORDER GRANTING24 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/18/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 4/8/2025. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 19, 2025
25 25 adr Notice of ADR/Mediation Outcome Sun 01/19 3:37 PM
Notice of Alternative Dispute Resolution/Mediation Outcome: Did not Settle. Amount of fee: $1900. (Frost, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
24 24 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 01/17 4:28 PM
Opposed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Trevor A Arnold.(Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Monday, October 14, 2024
23 23 misc Pretrial Disclosures Mon 10/14 9:23 AM
Pretrial Disclosures Defendant's Expert Designation by JTC USA Holdings Inc.. (Malone, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 09/20 3:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING21 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Mediation Completed by 1/17/2025, Discovery due by 1/17/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2025. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
21 21 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 09/19 9:01 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Trevor A Arnold. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
20 20 trial Expert Witness List Fri 09/13 9:51 AM
DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Trevor A Arnold. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 09/05 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gillian Vawn Malone on behalf of JTC USA Holdings Inc.. Attorney Gillian Vawn Malone added to party JTC USA Holdings Inc.(pty:dft) (Malone, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/08 3:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/15/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2024,. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order Cancelling Deadline Thu 12/07 1:49 PM
ORDER Cancelling Initial Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 12/07 10:55 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David A. Ezra for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 12/06 5:23 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Graves on behalf of JTC USA Holdings Inc.. Attorney Daniel J. Graves added to party JTC USA Holdings Inc.(pty:dft) (Graves, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 11/28 11:07 AM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2023 at 1:00 PM before Judge Susan Hightower.. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
13 13 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Mon 10/09 3:12 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by JTC USA Holdings Inc.. (Moscowitz, Barry)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
12 12 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/15 2:43 PM
CORRECTED NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Trevor A Arnold. (Inurria, Nathan) Modified on 9/15/2023 (dm)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/15 2:14 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Trevor A Arnold. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 09/15 2:11 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by Trevor A Arnold. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
9 9 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Wed 08/16 3:47 PM
Pro Hac Vice Letter addressed to Shaniqua Biggins regarding admission status. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/15 2:35 PM
Defendant's Original ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney Barry A. Moscowitz added to party JTC USA Holdings Inc.(pty:dft) by JTC USA Holdings Inc..(Moscowitz, Barry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 06/14 2:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trevor A Arnold as to Trevor A Arnold. Waiver sent on 6/9/2023, answer due 8/8/2023. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Thu 06/01 12:59 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Trevor A Arnold. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
5 5 notice Deficiency Notice Wed 05/31 10:17 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 3 Certificate of Interested Parties (cc3)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Deficiency Notice Wed 05/31 10:17 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 2 Request for Issuance of Summons (cc3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Tue 05/30 4:52 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Trevor Arnold. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/30 4:11 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Trevor Arnold. (Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/30 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17495623), filed by Trevor Arnold.(Inurria, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Jury Demand Wed 05/31 8:55 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Trevor A Arnold. (cc3)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/31 8:55 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cc3)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 05/31 8:56 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cc3)
Related: [-]