New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Rochon
Case #: 1:23-cv-04510
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 4:33 AM EST
Defendant
Mondrian Collection, LLC
Mondrian Collection 580 5th Ave. Ste 1135
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Patrick Papalia
contact info
Defendant
Lisbeth Sylvain
384 E 194th Street Apt. 1K
Bronx, NY 10458
Represented By
Patrick Papalia
contact info
Plaintiff
Aira Jewels, LLC
Aira Jewels LLC 10 W. 46th Street 12th Floor
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
David Michael Fish
Steiner & Fish P.C.
contact info
Olivia Loftin
contact info
Siddartha Rao
Romano Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
52 52 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 05/13 9:26 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Patrick Papalia, Esq. dated May 13, 2025 re:47 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Siddartha Rao dated May 8, 2025. . Document filed by Mondrian Collection, LLC, Lisbeth Sylvain..(Llano, Rafael)
Related: [-]
51 51 motion Discovery Tue 05/13 9:17 PM
LETTER MOTION for Discovery to Waive Objections addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Patrick Papalia, Esq. dated May 13, 2025. Document filed by Mondrian Collection, LLC, Lisbeth Sylvain..(Llano, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - G to Defendants' Letter Motion
Saturday, May 10, 2025
50 50 misc Letter Sat 05/10 11:39 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Patrick Papalia, Esq. Document filed by Mondrian Collection, LLC, Lisbeth Sylvain..(Llano, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
49 49 order Protective Order Fri 05/09 11:36 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO STIPULATED AND AGREED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 5/9/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
48 48 misc Proposed Protective Order Thu 05/08 8:31 PM
PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Aira Jewels, LLC..(Rao, Siddartha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Model Protective Order
47 47 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 05/08 8:16 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon from Siddartha Rao dated May 8, 2025. Document filed by Aira Jewels, LLC..(Rao, Siddartha)
Related: [-]