Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00693
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Bivens Prisoner
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Terminated:Jun 20, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, June 20, 2024
23 23 9 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Thu 06/20 6:01 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER that this civil action be and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, Dkt. No.11, is DISMISSED as MOOT. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk record this dismissal for purposes of the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. on 06/20/2024. See Order for further details. (triv)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
22 22 misc Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) Wed 04/17 12:49 PM
Sealed Exhibit re18 Prisoner Complaint filed by N'Neka Henderson(Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, April 05, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (1983) Mon 04/08 1:51 PM
ORDER granting20 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 4/5/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
20 20 motion Pro Se E-Noticing Fri 03/29 10:16 AM
MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by N'Neka Henderson.(Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, March 08, 2024
19 19 misc Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) Tue 03/12 9:09 AM
Sealed Exhibit(s) re18 SECOND AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT(Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B
18 18 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Tue 03/12 9:08 AM
SECOND AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against Charolotte Botvinis, Dale Moreno, Wellpath, filed by N'Neka Henderson.(Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
17 17 1 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (1983) Mon 03/11 11:01 AM
It is hereby ORDERED that, Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, Dkt. No. 15, be and is GRANTED, and her response to the Court's January 24, 2024 order is due on or before April 1, 2024. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 3/8/2024. (Sbro)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 03/11 10:54 AM
Document filed in error and removed (Sbro, ). Modified on 3/11/2024 (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Wed 03/06 8:58 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to file Amended 1983 civil suit filed by N'Neka Henderson.(Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
14 14 7 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (1983) Wed 01/24 4:10 PM
it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff particularize and amend her complaint in an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order using the enclosed standardized § 1983 complaint form (See Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/24/2024. (Sbro)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Thu 01/18 12:29 PM
Letter to The Court filed by N'Neka Henderson(Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, December 18, 2023
12 12 misc Sealed Document Wed 12/20 10:05 AM
Letter to The Court filed by N'Neka Henderson (Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/01 12:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by N'Neka Henderson.(Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 12, 2023
10 10 7 pgs order Order Thu 10/12 3:36 PM
Plaintiff has not paid either the $350 filing fee or the $52 administrative fee required to commence a civil action in this Court. See 28 U.S.C. § 1914(a), (c); Local Civil Rule 54(A). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff either pay the filing fees, or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's failure to comply with any part of this Order within THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, or failure to notify this Court immediately in the event she is transferred, released, or otherwise relocated, may result in the dismissal of this complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (b). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/12/2023. (Dcrow, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
9 9 misc Letter Tue 09/26 2:03 PM
Letter to the Court and notification of new address, filed by N'Neka Henderson (Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Fri 06/30 11:17 AM
Letter to the Court notifying of release date and new address, filed by N'Neka Henderson. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, June 15, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/16 1:08 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yes Care filed by N'Neka Henderson.(jlan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, June 08, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Wed 06/14 10:20 AM
Letter to the Court filed by N'Neka Henderson. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
5 5 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 06/12 2:37 PM
PLRA Filing fee received: $ 191.52, receipt number 100002556 (swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Voucher
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
4 4 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Wed 06/07 2:13 PM
Amended Prisoner COMPLAINT against Riverside Regional Jail, Medical Department, filed by N'Neka Henderson.(nneb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, June 02, 2023
3 3 6 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (1983) Fri 06/02 3:37 PM
ORDERED that the complaint be and is conditionally filed pending compliance with the requirements of this Order; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel [Dkt. No. 1] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff particularize and amend his complaint in an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order using the enclosed standardized § 1983 complaint form (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 6/2/2023. (nneb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
2 2 utility Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt Tue 05/30 8:52 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Tue 05/30 8:42 AM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against Riverside Regional Jail, filed by N'Neka Henderson.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Prisoner Data Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope