Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael S Nachmanoff
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-00694
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Terminated:Aug 08, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
6 6 order Dismissal Order (1983) Tue 08/08 4:49 PM
ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 8/8/2023. (nneb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
5 5 misc Letter Tue 07/18 4:18 PM
Letter to the Court filed by Phillip Morris Washington.(show)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, July 13, 2023
4 4 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 07/17 9:03 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (show)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (1983) Fri 06/30 3:30 PM
ORDERED that the Complaint is conditionally filed pending compliance with the requirements of this Order; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff is assessed a filing fee of $350.00 and an administrative fee of $52.00, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1914(a); and it is further ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of the entry date of this Order, plaintiff either pay the $402.00 due in case initiation fees or submit a completed application for permission to proceed IFP, including a Consent to Collection of Fees from Inmate Trust Account form (Consent Form) (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 6/30/2023. (show)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
2 2 utility Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt Tue 05/30 3:42 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. (show)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Tue 05/30 3:30 PM
Prisoner COMPLAINT against Lead Warden B. Cabell, Major S. Cain, Assistant Warden T. Green, Warden K. McCoy, Sussex 1 State Prison Medical Department, filed by Phillip Morris Washington.(show)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Prisoners Database,
Att: 3 Envelope