Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-00696
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Terminated:Sep 11, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, September 11, 2023
6 6 order Dismissal Order (2254) Mon 09/11 2:01 PM
ORDERED that this action be and is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Should Petitioner submit the full $5.00 filing fee within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order, the Clerk shall reopen the action (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 9/11/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
7 7 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 09/11 2:20 PM
PLRA Filing fee received: $ 35.93, receipt number 100003751 (swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Voucher
Friday, July 14, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/14 2:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Quinlan Adelfio on behalf of Greensville Correctional Center (Adelfio, Katherine)
Related: [-]
notice Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 07/14 2:12 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF Receipt as to3 Order of Prisoner Service (2254), filed by Greensville Correctional Center. (Adelfio, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Prisoner Service (2254) Fri 07/07 12:37 PM
ORDERED that the petition be and is conditionally filed pending compliance with the requirements of this Order; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner either pay the filing fee, or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/7/202. (swil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
2 2 utility Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt Tue 05/30 10:44 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. (swil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Tue 05/30 10:42 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Dai'Shawn Marquis Neal.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachments,
Att: 2 Prisoner Date Sheet,
Att: 3 Envelope