Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Jamar K Walker
Referred: Lawrence R Leonard
Case #: 4:23-cv-00067
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 5:39 AM EST
Defendant
R&N Corporation of Virginia
Plaintiff
Veronica Huamani
Represented By
David Hilton Wise
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Benjamin F Johns
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Joseph Michael Langone
Wise Law Firm, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 20, 2023
12 12 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Thu 07/20 10:56 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: It is ORDERED that the following cases are consolidated for all purposes: 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71; and 4:23-cv-76. All filings shall be made in the lead case, 4:23-cv-66. The Clerk is DIRECTED to amend the case name of lead case 4:23-cv-66 on CM/ECF to: In re R&B Corporation of Virginia d/b/a Credit Control Corporation, Data Security Breach Litigation. It is ORDERED that Bryan L. Bleichner of Chestnut Cambronne PA, Benjamin F. Johns of Shub & Johns LLC, and Gary M. Klinger of Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman LLC are hereby APPOINTED as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and David Hilton Wise of the Wise Law Firm PLC is hereby APPOINTED as Liaison Counsel. The plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an amended, consolidated complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Memorandum Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any action subsequently filed in, transferred to, or removed to this Court that arises out of similar facts as the above-captioned cases may be consolidated by the Court based on notice of such filing by plaintiffs' counsel or defendants counsel and the passage of ten (10) days, or on the Court's own motion and notice. If any party objects to such consolidation or otherwise wishes to seek alternative relief, they must do so before the expiration of the 10-day period. See Order for additional details. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 7/20/2023. (afar)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 07/20 11:50 AM
All Future Docket Entries Will Be Made In the Lead Case, 4:23cv66. (afar)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation Mon 07/17 6:14 PM
STIPULATION re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71 ,9 Stipulation, Consolidate Cases and to appoint Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Class Counsel by Veronica Huamani.(Wise, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 06, 2023
10 10 4 pgs order Order Fri 07/07 11:58 AM
ORDER. All counsel of record for the plaintiffs in cases 4:23-cv-66, 4:23-cv-67, 4:23-cv-68, 4:23-cv-69, 4:23-cv-70, and 4:23-cv-71 are ORDERED to consult with counsel for the plaintiff in 4:23-cv-76 regarding the appointment of class counsel and consolidation of all seven cases. Counsel for the plaintiffs are further ORDERED to file amended motions, supplemental briefs, or other filings as are necessary to include the seventh-filed case (4:23-cv-76) in the relief sought in the motions. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 7/6/23. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 01, 2023
9 9 misc Stipulation Sat 07/01 4:18 PM
STIPULATION re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71 by Veronica Huamani.(Wise, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Consolidate Cases,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/28 11:38 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Mon 06/05 2:54 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Benjamin F. Johns as to Veronica Huamani. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 6/5/2023. (awoo, )
Related: [-]
7 7 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 06/05 11:12 AM
Memorandum in Support re6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71 filed by Veronica Huamani.(Wise, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
6 6 motion Consolidate Cases Mon 06/05 11:04 AM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71 by Veronica Huamani.(Wise, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 01, 2023
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/01 11:36 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin F. Johns and Certification of Local Counsel David Hilton Wise Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8962184. by Veronica Huamani. (Wise, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 05/31 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to R&N Corporation of Virginia, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
3 3 misc Citizenship Disclosure Form Tue 05/30 7:39 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Veronica Huamani. (Wise, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 05/30 7:38 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Veronica Huamani. (Wise, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/30 7:36 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8958661.), filed by Veronica Huamani.(Wise, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 05/31 10:43 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
Related: [-]