Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:23-cv-00502
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Terminated:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 3:27 AM CST
Defendant
Access2Care, A Division of Global Medical Response, Inc.
4400 Route 121
Lewisville, TX 75056
Represented By
Sydnie Alexis Shimkus
Bell Nunnally & Martin Llp - Dallas
contact info
Alana Kalantzakis Ackels
Bell Nunnally & Martin Llp - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Bailem
3141 Hood St Ste 500
Dallas, TX 75219
Represented By
Nicholas Alban O'Kelly
The Law Offices Of Nick O'Kelly PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 02/04 11:01 AM
ORDER granting10 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. It is therefore ORDERED that all claims in this case by Plaintiff Ashley Bailem against Defendant Accesss2care, a Division of Global Medical Response, Inc., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.It is further ORDERED that the parties shall pay their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/4/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 02/03 4:13 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Ashley Bailem.(O'Kelly, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 11, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediator Thu 07/11 4:47 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. The Court hereby ORDERS that this case be submitted to mediation in accordance with this Court's mediation plan. The parties have agreed upon Kathy Fragnoli. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 7/11/2024. (rpc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/10 7:29 PM
JOINT NOTICE of Joint Report on Mediator Selection by Access2Care, A Division of Global Medical Response, Inc. (Ackels, Alana)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
7 7 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Fri 02/09 11:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2024. Discovery due by 7/24/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 3/20/2024. Jury instructions due by 1/29/2025. Mediation Completion due by 8/21/2024. Designation of Mediator due by 7/10/2024. Motions due by 8/14/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2025. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/9/2024. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/02 3:40 PM
NOTICE: The Rule 16 management conference set for 2/7/2023 is cancelled. The Court will issue a scheduling order. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
6 6 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 01/12 3:05 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
5 5 11 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Wed 12/06 4:06 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/12/2024. Rule 16 Management Conference SET for 2/7/2024 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/6/2023. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/14 5:32 PM
Defendant's Original ANSWER to1 Complaint by Access2Care, A Division of Global Medical Response, Inc..(Ackels, Alana)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 09/14 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons submitted by Ashley Bailem. The document should be filed using event Summons Returned Executed. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Wed 09/13 1:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action and Plaintiffs Original Complaint served on ACCESS2CARE, A DIVISION OF GLOBAL MEDICAL RESPONSE, INC. care of its Registered Agent, CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY D/B/A CSC - LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE COMPANY by and through its authorized agent, KANEISHA GROSS, on 8/24/23, filed by Ashley Bailem. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 08/23 3:55 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Access2Care, A Division of Global Medical Response, Inc. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/30 6:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Access2Care, A Division of Global Medical Response, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9524483.), filed by Ashley Bailem.(O'Kelly, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/31 10:08 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Wed 05/31 10:09 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (rpc, )
Related: [-]