United States of America v. Kraska
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jose E Martinez |
Referred: | Shaniek Mills Maynard |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-14155 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant
Michael Kraska
|
|
Petitioner
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Government's Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, (ECF No.1 ), is GRANTED. The Government's Motion to Amend, (ECF No.14 ), is GRANTED. This Court's previous Order Adopting R&R, (ECF No.13 ), is VACATED. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for statistical purposes only. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Tuesday, December 31, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION to Amend/Correct13 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,, Order Dismissing/Closing Case,, Order on Report and Recommendations, by United States of America. Responses due by 1/14/2025.(Lugo, Jeanette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 11, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER ADOPTING10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Government's Petition to Enforce IRS Summons, (ECF No.1 ), is GRANTED. Respondent Michael Kraska is ORDERED to respond to the August 9, 2022, IRS Summons within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for statistical purposes only. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail
Mon 12/02 4:35 PM
FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 7 Order,4 Order,1 Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America US Mail returned for: Michael Kraska. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (wce) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Non-Objection by United States of America re10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America Recommending I respectfully RECOMMEND that: 1. The Government's Petition to Enforce IRS Summons be GRANTED.. (Lugo, Jeanette) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Petition (Complaint) to Quash/Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. I respectfully RECOMMEND that: The Government's Petition to Enforce IRS Summons be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 12/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard on 11/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
minutes
Show Cause Hearing
Tue 11/05 9:02 PM
Paperless Minute Entry for proceedings held before U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard: Show Cause Hearing on Petition to Enforce IRS Summons1 held on 11/5/2024. Total time in court: 17 Minutes. Appearances: Jeanette Marie Lugo and Steven R. Petri for the United States of America || Respondent Michael Kraska did not appear. United States of America to provide proposed report and recommendation by Tuesday, November 12, 2024. Court Reporter: Laura Melton, 772-467-2327/Laura_Melton@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jd02) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Compliance
Wed 09/25 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Compliance re 7 Order. DE#1 , DE#4 and DE# 7 mailed to Mr. Kraska via certified mail at 516 SE Felix Avenue, Port St. Lucie, FL 34984. (scn) |
|
7 | 7
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 09/25 2:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER SUA SPONTE RESETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING: To accommodate weather-related concerns and to ensure proper notice to Defendant at his new address, the Show Cause Hearing currently set for September 27, 2024, is RESET to Tuesday, November 5, 2024, at 1:00 P.M. at the U.S. District Courthouse located at 101 South U.S. Highway 1, Fort Pierce, Florida 34950 in Courtroom 4074. Further, the Government's Notice of Constructive Service6 indicates that Defendant Michael Kraska has a new address. To ensure Mr. Kraska has notice of these proceedings, I direct the Clerk of Court to send the Government's Petition to Enforce Summons1 , the Order setting Show Cause Hearing4 , and a copy of this Order, to Mr. Kraska's current address of 516 SE Felix Avenue, Port St. Lucie, FL 34984 by certified mail. Mr. Kraska shall have until October 15, 2024, to file any defense or opposition to the pending Petition. The Government may file a reply memorandum to any opposition at least five (5) days prior to the date set for the show cause hearing. The Clerk of Court is further directed to file a notice of compliance with this Order to confirm it was mailed to Defendant. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard on 9/25/2024. (jd02) Modified text on 9/25/2024 (scn) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Constructive Service by United States of America re4 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, (Lugo, Jeanette) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Reassignment of Assistant U.S. Attorney by Jeanette Marie Lugo on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Felipe Plechac-Diaz representing United States of America (Petitioner) terminated.. Attorney Jeanette Marie Lugo added to party United States of America(pty:pet). (Lugo, Jeanette) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ORDER SETTING SHOW CAUSE HEARING-Show Cause Hearing set for 9/27/2024 02:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard on 7/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (mab) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS: This cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Shaniek Mills Maynard for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters, and for a Report and Recommendation on all dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) | |
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |