Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rebecca Beach Smith
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 2:23-cv-00234
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
CauseMotion for Protective Order
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Terminated:Jan 16, 2024
Case in other court:Portsmouth General District Court, GV23003874-00
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:58 AM EST
Petitioner
Brittany Blake
127 Attwater Lane
Portsmouth, VA 23702
Respondent
Cassidy C. Norman
Represented By
Sean Douglas Jansen
United States Attorney'S Office - Norfolk
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 14, 2024
9 9 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/14 11:51 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Brittany Blake @ 127 Attwater Lane Portsmouth, VA 23702. The Court's Dismissal Order, dated 1/16/24, returned as undelivered. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
8 8 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 01/16 4:23 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 1/16/24. (epri, )
Related: [-]
7 7 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 01/16 4:18 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER: Respondent's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 4, is GRANTED, and this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. A copy of this Dismissal Order sent to Petitioner and counsel for Respondent as DIRECTED on 1.16.24. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 1/16/24. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
6 6 misc Roseboro Notice Wed 06/07 1:01 AM
Roseboro Notice by Cassidy C. Norman (Jansen, Sean)
Related: [-]
5 5 17 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 06/07 12:34 AM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. filed by Cassidy C. Norman.(Jansen, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Cassidy Norman
4 4 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 06/07 12:33 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. by Cassidy C. Norman. (Jansen, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
3 3 notice Notice (other) Tue 06/06 11:03 AM
NOTICE by Cassidy C. Norman re1 Notice of Removal (Corrected Notice of Removal)(Jansen, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (State Court Filings)
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
2 2 utility Mag Notice / Judge Information Wed 05/31 11:13 AM
Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/31 10:24 AM
Notice of Removal , filed by Cassidy C. Norman.(Jansen, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (State Court Filings),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 05/31 11:12 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
Related: [-]