Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Claude M Hilton
Referred: John F Anderson
Case #: 1:23-cv-00707
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Terminated:Jan 03, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
Jane Does 1 Through 10
Represented By
Carolyn M. Wesnousky
Us Attorneys Office, Eastern District Of Virginia
contact info
Defendant
John Does 1 Through 10
Represented By
Carolyn M. Wesnousky
Us Attorneys Office, Eastern District Of Virginia
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
Represented By
Carolyn M. Wesnousky
Us Attorneys Office, Eastern District Of Virginia
contact info
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Carolyn M. Wesnousky
Us Attorneys Office, Eastern District Of Virginia
contact info
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By
Carolyn M. Wesnousky
Us Attorneys Office, Eastern District Of Virginia
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Carolyn M. Wesnousky
Us Attorneys Office, Eastern District Of Virginia
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Carolyn M. Wesnousky
Us Attorneys Office, Eastern District Of Virginia
contact info
Plaintiff
Romany Beshay
Represented By
Joshua Harry Erlich
The Erlich Law Office PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
8 8 order So Ordered Wed 01/03 3:33 PM
So Ordered re7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Romany Beshay. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 01/03/2024. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 01/02 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Romany Beshay (Erlich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 07/20 4:02 PM
ORDERED that the parties' motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until further order of this Court; and it is herebyORDERED that the parties shall file a status report with this Court one hundred and twenty (120) days after Plaintiff's asylum interview and then every sixty (60) days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 07/20/2023. (dvanm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
5 5 motion Stay Tue 07/18 10:21 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by Department of Homeland Security, Jane Does 1 Through 10, John Does 1 Through 10, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States of America.(Wesnousky, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/18 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn M. Wesnousky on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Jane Does 1 Through 10, John Does 1 Through 10, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States of America (Wesnousky, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 06/07 12:00 PM
Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(dvanm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Wed 05/31 2:06 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Romany Beshay. (Erlich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Mandamus Wed 05/31 1:59 PM
PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Romany Beshay.(Erlich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment
misc Electronic Fee Payment - 402.00 Fee* Wed 05/31 2:02 PM
Electronic Fee Payment - as to1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Romany Beshay. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8960362.. (Erlich, Joshua)
Related: [-]
utility Initial Case Assignment Thu 06/01 10:29 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm)
Related: [-]