Wiggins v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jamar K Walker |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00236 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:17-cv-16751 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:59 AM EST |
Defendant
Sanofi US Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Warren Wiggins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/16 4:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gloria Warren Wiggins and by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 11/03 10:39 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Counsel for the Plaintiff are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why their appearances in this case should not be stricken. If local counsel for the Plaintiff does not enter an appearance within 14 days of this Order, Counsel for the Plaintiff will be stricken from the docket sheet and the Plaintiff will have to proceed Pro Se. Copies distributed as directed 11/3/23. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 11/3/2023. (Vpea) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/12 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Houston on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Houston, Olivia) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 10/02 1:04 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher J Kaufman; Adrienne L Byard and Matt DePaz terminated. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 10/2/2023. (Walker, Jamar) |
||
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 09/29 4:41 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney the appearances of Matt DePaz, Christopher J. Kaufman, and Adrienne L. Byard by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Wayne, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 09/25 5:02 PM
Clerk's Notice of Local counsel requirement mailed to (Defendant's) counsel. (Vpea) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 09/25 4:59 PM
Clerk's Notice of Local Counsel requirement mailed to (Plaintiff's) foreign counsel. (Vpea) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 09/06 3:52 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (afar) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 06/26 11:12 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Pro hac vice for Harley Victor Ratliff as to Sanofi US Services, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 06/26/2023. (tlev, ) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/22 1:48 PM
Second Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Harley Ratliff and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 06/21 2:32 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion for Pro hac vice for Christopher S McRae as to Sanofi US Services, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 06/21/2023. (tlev, ) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 06/21 2:27 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Pro hac vice for Stephen Nichols as to Sanofi US Services, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 06/21/2023. (tlev, ) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 06/21 2:42 PM
Notice of Correction re18 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Harley Ratliff and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne . The motion does not match the docket entry regarding parties represented. Counsel should re file the motion with the corrected information. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, ) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/16 12:06 PM
Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Harley Ratliff and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/16 12:03 PM
Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher McRae and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/16 12:01 PM
Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Nichols and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 06/14 11:22 AM
Notice of Correction re14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Nichols13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Harley Ratliff15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher McRae and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne. The motions do not contain the signatures of the applicants. Local counsel should file corrected motions that include the written signatures of the applicants. Counsel should not pay the fees a second time. (tlev, ) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/13 1:12 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher McRae and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8979253. by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/13 1:06 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Nichols and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8979222. by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/13 12:59 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Harley Ratliff and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne Filing fee $ 75, receipt number BVAEDC-8979187. by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/07 7:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service Amended re11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of All Defendants (Wayne, Charles) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/07 5:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services, Inc.. (Wayne, Charles) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/07 5:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 05/31 3:00 PM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-16751. Original file and docket sheet received. |
|
notice
Notification of Transfer
Wed 05/31 3:04 PM
Notification of transfer of civil case from the Eastern District of Louisiana Case No. 2:17cv16751 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, ) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/12/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 15836) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.] | |
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Case Specific)(McRae, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.] | |
Att: 1 1, | ||
Att: 2 2, | ||
Att: 3 3 | ||
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. General(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.] | |
Att: 1 1, | ||
Att: 2 2, | ||
Att: 3 3, | ||
Att: 4 4, | ||
Att: 5 5, | ||
Att: 6 6, | ||
Att: 7 7, | ||
Att: 8 8, | ||
Att: 9 9, | ||
Att: 10 10, | ||
Att: 11 11, | ||
Att: 12 12, | ||
Att: 13 13, | ||
Att: 14 14, | ||
Att: 15 15, | ||
Att: 16 16, | ||
Att: 17 17, | ||
Att: 18 18, | ||
Att: 19 19, | ||
Att: 20 20, | ||
Att: 21 21, | ||
Att: 22 22, | ||
Att: 23 23, | ||
Att: 24 24, | ||
Att: 25 25, | ||
Att: 26 26, | ||
Att: 27 27, | ||
Att: 28 28, | ||
Att: 29 29, | ||
Att: 30 30, | ||
Att: 31 31, | ||
Att: 32 32, | ||
Att: 33 33, | ||
Att: 34 34, | ||
Att: 35 35, | ||
Att: 36 36, | ||
Att: 37 37, | ||
Att: 38 38, | ||
Att: 39 39, | ||
Att: 40 40, | ||
Att: 41 41, | ||
Att: 42 42, | ||
Att: 43 43, | ||
Att: 44 44, | ||
Att: 45 45, | ||
Att: 46 46, | ||
Att: 47 47, | ||
Att: 48 48, | ||
Att: 49 49, | ||
Att: 50 50, | ||
Att: 51 51, | ||
Att: 52 52, | ||
Att: 53 53, | ||
Att: 54 54, | ||
Att: 55 55, | ||
Att: 56 56, | ||
Att: 57 57, | ||
Att: 58 58, | ||
Att: 59 59, | ||
Att: 60 60, | ||
Att: 61 61, | ||
Att: 62 62, | ||
Att: 63 63, | ||
Att: 64 64, | ||
Att: 65 65, | ||
Att: 66 66, | ||
Att: 67 67, | ||
Att: 68 68, | ||
Att: 69 69, | ||
Att: 70 70, | ||
Att: 71 71, | ||
Att: 72 72, | ||
Att: 73 73, | ||
Att: 74 74, | ||
Att: 75 75, | ||
Att: 76 76, | ||
Att: 77 77, | ||
Att: 78 78, | ||
Att: 79 79, | ||
Att: 80 80, | ||
Att: 81 81, | ||
Att: 82 82, | ||
Att: 83 83, | ||
Att: 84 84, | ||
Att: 85 85, | ||
Att: 86 86, | ||
Att: 87 87, | ||
Att: 88 88, | ||
Att: 89 89, | ||
Att: 90 90, | ||
Att: 91 91, | ||
Att: 92 92, | ||
Att: 93 93, | ||
Att: 94 94, | ||
Att: 95 95, | ||
Att: 96 96, | ||
Att: 97 97, | ||
Att: 98 98, | ||
Att: 99 99, | ||
Att: 100 100, | ||
Att: 101 101, | ||
Att: 102 102, | ||
Att: 103 103, | ||
Att: 104 104, | ||
Att: 105 105, | ||
Att: 106 106, | ||
Att: 107 107, | ||
Att: 108 108, | ||
Att: 109 109, | ||
Att: 110 110, | ||
Att: 111 111, | ||
Att: 112 112, | ||
Att: 113 113, | ||
Att: 114 114, | ||
Att: 115 115, | ||
Att: 116 116 | ||
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.] | |
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.] | |
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.] | |
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6529249) filed by Gloria Warren-Wiggins.Attorney Peter J. Flowers added to party Gloria Warren-Wiggins(pty:pla).(Flowers, Peter) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Sanofi US Services, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Sanofi-Aventis |