Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:23-cv-00709
Nature of Suit540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Terminated:Aug 21, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 21, 2023
7 7 order So Ordered Mon 08/21 10:40 AM
So Ordered in re6 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 8/21/2023. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
6 6 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/17 6:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Jedidah Hussey, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Sarah Taylor. (Loftus, Meghan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/17 6:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Elizabeth Loftus on behalf of Jedidah Hussey, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Sarah Taylor (Loftus, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Thu 06/22 11:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhaltuona Biekemituowa. All Defendants. (Eijo de Tezanos Pinto, Maria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 06/15 10:29 AM
Summons Issued as to Jedidah Hussey, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Sarah Taylor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(Sbro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 06/13 2:12 PM
Proposed Summons 1:23-cv-00709 by Zhaltuona Biekemituowa. (Eijo de Tezanos Pinto, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/31 4:03 PM
Complaint 1:23-cv-709 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8961028.), filed by Zhaltuona Biekemituowa.(Eijo de Tezanos Pinto, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to 10
utility Initial Case Assignment Thu 06/01 9:55 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (swil)
Related: [-]