CooperPriest 237 LLC v. Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00710 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:59 AM EST |
Defendant
Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
1 Hartford Plaza
Hartford, CT 06144 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
HRH Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Martin Scahill
|
|
Defendant
Selective Way Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Rachael Traverso
|
|
Plaintiff
CooperPriest 237 LLC
509 24th Street S
Arlington, VA 22202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 09/28 11:02 AM
ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. 31) is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 9/27/2023. (swil) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 09/20 11:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Green, Bryant) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (other)
Mon 09/11 1:13 PM
NOTICE by CooperPriest 237 LLC re31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (Brown, C.) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 09/11 11:46 AM
Notice of Correction re31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (swil) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 09/08 4:49 PM
Memorandum in Support re31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CooperPriest 237 LLC.(Brown, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 09/08 4:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CooperPriest 237 LLC. (Brown, C.) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/29 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CooperPriest 237 LLC HRH Services, LLC served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023 (Brown, C.) |
|
29 | 29
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/29 10:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CooperPriest 237 LLC Rachael Traverso served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023 (Brown, C.) |
|
28 | 28
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/29 10:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CooperPriest 237 LLC Martin Scahill served on 8/11/2023, answer due 9/1/2023 (Brown, C.) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/14 9:56 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.(Green, Bryant) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/02 11:15 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CooperPriest 237 LLC Selective Way Insurance Company served on 8/1/2023, answer due 8/22/2023 (Brown, C.) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/28 9:58 AM
Summons Issued as to HRH Services, LLC, Martin Scahill, Selective Way Insurance Company, Rachael Traverso, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(swil) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Notice | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/27 10:51 AM
Proposed Summons re20 Amended Complaint, (Martin Scahill) by CooperPriest 237 LLC. (Brown, C.) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/27 10:50 AM
Proposed Summons re20 Amended Complaint, (Rachael Traverso) by CooperPriest 237 LLC. (Brown, C.) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/27 10:49 AM
Proposed Summons re20 Amended Complaint, (HRH SERVICES, LLC a/k/a HRH SERVICES, INC. by CooperPriest 237 LLC. (Brown, C.) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 07/27 10:47 AM
Proposed Summons re20 Amended Complaint, (Selective Way Insurance Company) by CooperPriest 237 LLC. (Brown, C.) |
|
20 | 20
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 07/27 10:46 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, filed by CooperPriest 237 LLC.(Brown, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 07/25 4:58 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint as a separate docket entry and promptly serve the amended complaint on the newly named defendants. It is further ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for Friday, August 11, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 07/25/2023. (wgar, ) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 07/25 2:09 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and To Add Parties filed by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. |
|
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/21 7:35 AM
Set Deadline as to15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and To Add Parties. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (wgar, ) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Thu 07/20 4:17 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for August 11, 2023 re15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and To Add Parties (Brown, C.) |
|
16 | 16
10
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 07/20 4:16 PM
Memorandum in Support re15 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and To Add Parties filed by CooperPriest 237 LLC.(Brown, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 07/20 4:14 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and To Add Parties by CooperPriest 237 LLC.(Brown, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint Redline, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint Clean, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 20 | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
5
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Tue 07/11 4:03 PM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made in the Joint Discovery Plan (Docket no. 13), and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 10), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 07/11/2023. See order for further details.(Dcrow, ) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Discovery Plan
Mon 07/10 2:06 PM
JOINT Discovery Plan by CooperPriest 237 LLC.(Brown, C.) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Mon 07/10 2:05 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by CooperPriest 237 LLC. (Brown, C.) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/10 2:01 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CooperPriest 237 LLC. (Brown, C.) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/29 4:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. Discovery due by 11/10/2023. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 6/29/2023.(tarm) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/27 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by George Edwin Reede, Jr on behalf of Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/27 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryant Steven Green on behalf of Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Green, Bryant) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Tue 06/27 2:42 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Green, Bryant) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/27 2:41 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Green, Bryant) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/27 2:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company.(Green, Bryant) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/06 12:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CooperPriest 237 LLC Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company served on 6/6/2023, answer due 6/27/2023 (Brown, C.) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/01 9:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(swil) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Notice | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 05/31 3:57 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by CooperPriest 237 LLC. (Brown, C.) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/31 3:53 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8960937.), filed by CooperPriest 237 LLC.(Brown, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 06/01 9:24 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (swil) |