Maryland District Court
Judge:Peter J Messitte
Case #: 8:23-cv-01465
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Terminated:May 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
Michael and Son Services, Inc.
Represented By
Nat Calamis
Carr Maloney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shaddy Abdelaal
Represented By
Daniel E Kenney
Dk Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 06, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/06 10:22 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving20 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Shaddy Abdelaal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/6/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/03 11:00 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Shaddy Abdelaal(Kenney, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Fri 04/12 2:41 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Michael and Son Services, Inc.(Calamis, Nat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
corresp Status Report - Requesting Tue 04/02 12:21 PM
PAPERLESS NOTICE REQUESTING STATUS REPORT and requesting that counsel/parties of record submit a Status Report in writing via electronic case filing as to the current status of this case by no later than close of business on Friday, April 12, 2024.(jmhs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 02/16 2:24 PM
ORDER granting16 Consent Motion to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/16/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time Fri 02/16 8:53 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by Michael and Son Services, Inc.(Calamis, Nat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
order Order Wed 01/17 1:49 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING14 Status Report. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/17/2024. (jmhs, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Tue 01/16 8:20 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Shaddy Abdelaal(Kenney, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/07 8:10 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to submit Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 12/6/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Supplement Wed 12/06 11:22 AM
Supplement to11 MOTION for Extension of Time of Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Deadline filed by Michael and Son Services, Inc. (Calamis, Nat)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/04 4:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time of Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Deadline by Michael and Son Services, Inc.(Calamis, Nat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
10 10 order Protective/Confidentiality Order Wed 10/18 10:23 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/17/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 10/16 2:39 PM
STIPULATION of Protective/Confidentiality Order by Michael and Son Services, Inc.(Calamis, Nat)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 07/21 2:59 PM
ORDER granting7 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order as set forth. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/20/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 07/21 3:02 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due 1/16/24. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 07/19 9:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (and modify initial scheduling order) by Shaddy Abdelaal(Kenney, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
6 6 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/06 8:09 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/17/2023. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/5/2023. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 07/05 4:08 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Michael and Son Services, Inc. (Calamis, Nat)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/05 3:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Michael and Son Services, Inc..(Calamis, Nat)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/02 10:32 AM
[FILED IN ERROR] Summons Issued 21 days as to Michael and Son Services, Inc.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/2/2023 (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 06/02 10:31 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Michael and Son Services, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/31 6:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael and Son Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10630441.), filed by Shaddy Abdelaal.(Kenney, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Errata 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons