North Dakota District Court
Judge:Daniel M Traynor
Case #: 1:23-cv-00106
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 2:36 AM CST
Amicus
Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By
Matt A. Crapo
Immigration Reform Law Institute
contact info
Defendant
David Neal
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Border Patrol
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Raul Ortiz
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Troy A. Miller
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Tae Johnson
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Executive Office for Immigration Review, United States of America
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Merrick Garland
Represented By
Christina P. Greer
Doj-Civ
contact info
Katherine Shinners
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Alaska, State of
Represented By
Cori Mills
State Of Alaska
contact info
Christopher Robison
State Of Alaska
contact info
Plaintiff
Kentucky, Commonwealth of
Represented By
Marc Manley
Kentucky Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Wyoming, State of
Represented By
Ryan Schelhaas
Wyoming Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Virginia, Commonwealth of
Represented By
Kevin Michael Gallagher
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Andrew N. Ferguson
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Utah, State of
Represented By
Melissa Holyoak
Office Of The Utah Attorney General
contact info
Christopher Bates
Utah Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Arkansas, State of
Represented By
Dylan L. Jacobs
Arkansas Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Florida, State of
Represented By
Natalie Christmas
Florida Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Idaho, State of
Represented By
Joshua N. Turner
Idaho Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Theodore J. Wold
Idaho Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Indiana, State of
Represented By
Betsy M DeNardi
Office Of Indiana Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Tennessee, State of
Represented By
Clark Lassiter Hildabrand
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
contact info
Whitney D. Hermandorfer
Office Of Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
South Carolina, State of
Represented By
Joseph David Spate
South Carolina Attorney General'S Office
contact info
James Emory Smith, Jr
S.C. Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Iowa, State of
Represented By
Eric H Wessan
Iowa Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Oklahoma, State of
Represented By
Gentner F Drummond
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Zachary Paul West
Oklahoma Attorney General
contact info
Garry M. Gaskins, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Audrey A Weaver
contact info
Plaintiff
North Dakota, State of
Represented By
Drew H. Wrigley
North Dakota Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Philip Axt
Nd Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
New Hampshire, State of
Represented By
Brandon F. Chase
Nh Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Montana, State of
Represented By
Christian Brian Corrigan
Montana Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Missouri, State of
Represented By
Joshua Divine
Office Of The Missouri Attorney General
contact info
Maria Lanahan
Office Of The Missouri Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Mississippi, State of
Represented By
Justin L. Matheny
Mississippi Attorney General'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, February 07, 2025
99 99 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 02/07 10:04 AM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting97 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Natalie Christmas terminated. (BG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
98 98 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/06 7:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Huang on behalf of Florida, State of (Huang, Allen)
Related: [-]
97 97 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/06 10:40 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Florida, State of. (Christmas, Natalie)
Related: [-]