Endo Biologics Limited
Member Case
Lead case is: 7:22-bk-22549
Lead case is: 7:22-bk-22549
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | James L Garrity Jr |
Case #: | 7:23-bk-22414 |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited
1400 Atwater Drive
Malvern, PA 19355 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004 |
Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago |
Thursday, December 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order signed on 12/5/2024 (I) Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases; (II) Granting Final Decrees in Certain Closed Chapter 11 Cases: (III) Amending Caption of Remaining Cases: and (IV) Granting Related Relief. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 12/05 11:06 PM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Catherine V. LoTempio on behalf of Endo Biologics Limited. (LoTempio, Catherine) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Mon 07/17 5:54 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated: All Schedules and Statements. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual /Global Notes and Statement of Financial Affairs for Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited Filed by Kyle J. Ortiz on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited. (Ortiz, Kyle) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual /Global Notes and Summary and Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited Filed by Kyle J. Ortiz on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited. (Ortiz, Kyle) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order signed on 7/6/2023 Granting Motion To Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information: Deadline: 7/14/2023 (Rodriguez, Willie) |
|
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Thu 07/06 12:29 PM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 6/14/2023. Schedule D due 6/14/2023. Schedule E/F due 6/14/2023. Schedule G due 6/14/2023. Schedule H due 6/14/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 6/14/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/14/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 6/14/2023, (Porter, Minnie) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 6/22/2023 at 11:09 AM RE: Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/28/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/7/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/21/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/31/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/28/2023. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 /Certificate of No Objection to Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs for the Additional Debtors and Any Future Debtors Filed by Kyle J. Ortiz on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited. (Ortiz, Kyle) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney For Debtor (Rule 2016(b))- Form 2030 Filed by Lisa Laukitis on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited. (Laukitis, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Thu 06/08 10:05 AM
Case Jointly Administrated with Case # 22-22549 per Order signed on 8/17/2023 in Case # 22-22549 Doc # 45. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
misc
Add Claims and Noticing Agent
Thu 06/08 10:10 AM
Claims and Noticing Agent, Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC, added to the case. (Rodriguez, Willie) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information /(Hearing Date: 6/22/2023 at 11:00 AM, Objection Deadline: 6/15/2023 at 4:00 PM) Notice of Hearing and Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Extending Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs for the Additional Debtors and Any Future Debtors (Attachment: Ex. A: Proposed Order) filed by Kyle J. Ortiz on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited with hearing to be held on 6/22/2023 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JLG) Objections due by 6/15/2023,. (Ortiz, Kyle) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
misc
Add Judge
Thu 06/01 7:59 AM
Judge James L. Garrity, Jr. added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Statement / Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Cases and Joint Administration filed by Paul D. Leake on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited. (Leake, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Case Designated As Mega as per LBR 1073-1. Filed by Paul D. Leake of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP on behalf of Operand Pharmaceuticals II Limited. (Leake, Paul) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 05/31 7:29 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-22414 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16224215. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |