New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Case #: 1:23-cv-04577
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause49:41713 Airline Deregulation Actv (premp of authority over prices, routes, and service)
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:43 AM EST
Cross Claimant
Bullion Exchange, LLC
Represented By
Marvin Nelson Romero
Gerber Ciano Kelly Brady LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Bullion Exchange, LLC
Represented By
Marvin Nelson Romero
Gerber Ciano Kelly Brady LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bullion Exchange, LLC
Represented By
Marvin Nelson Romero
Gerber Ciano Kelly Brady LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bullion Exchanges, LLC
Defendant
FedEx Corporation
942 South Shady Grove Road
Memphia, TN 38120
Represented By
Thomas Whitelaw Murrey
Federal Express Corporation Legal Department
contact info
Luis Sabillon
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Defendant
FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Zaher Merhi
Represented By
Vladimir Rene
Vladimir Rene
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
81 81 misc Letter Thu 05/15 1:06 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Andrew Kazin, Esq. dated May 15, 2025 re: settlement in principle. Document filed by Zaher Merhi..(Kazin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
80 80 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/15 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Notice of Entry re:79 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,69 MOTION for Reconsideration re;61 Memorandum & Opinion, Add and Terminate Parties,,,,,, .. Document filed by Bullion Exchange, LLC..(Romero, Marvin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
79 79 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Mon 05/12 5:54 PM
ORDER denying69 Motion for Reconsideration. Merhi's request for leave to amend his complaint is therefore denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 69. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/12/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]