Azalea Spa & Nails Inc. et al v. Zhang et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00712 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:59 AM EST |
Defendant
Maureen (Yan Juan) Meng
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zhidong Zhang
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Azalea Spa & Nails Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joanna Lee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 12/05 3:51 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ORDERED that attorneys George R.A. Doumar, Leon Demsky, and Raj H. Patel are hereby terminated as counsel of record for Defendants in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/05/2023. (wgar, ) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 12/01 2:45 PM
Memorandum in Support re24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Maureen (Yan Juan) Meng, Zhidong Zhang. (Doumar, George) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 12/01 2:44 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Maureen (Yan Juan) Meng, Zhidong Zhang.(Doumar, George) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/27 11:00 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Zhidong Zhang.(Doumar, George) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
11
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion Order
Tue 11/14 8:09 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER that Defendant Meng's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 10) is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Zhangs Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 12) is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Count II of the Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to the extent that it brings a breach of fiduciary duty on behalf of Plaintiff Lee individually against Defendant Zhang; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Counts III and IV of the Complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/13/2023. (swil) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 10/04 3:32 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Derrick Francis Moore for Azalea Spa & Nails Inc.,Derrick Francis Moore for Joanna Lee. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/4/2023. (swil) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 08/31 2:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Zhidong Zhang. (Doumar, George) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 08/31 2:36 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Maureen (Yan Juan) Meng. (Doumar, George) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
17
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Thu 08/17 4:42 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc., Joanna Lee.(Davis, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Monday, July 31, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/31 4:13 PM
ORDER that the16 Consent Motion for Extensions of Time for Briefing on Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED . Plaintiffs shall file any response to the Motion to Dismiss on or before August 17, 2023. Defendants shall file any reply to Plaintiffs response to the Motion to Dismiss on or before August 31, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 07/31/23. (pmil, ) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/27 12:42 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc., Joanna Lee.(Davis, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/27 12:35 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Derrick Moore and Certification of Local Counsel Kristin C. Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9047478. by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc., Joanna Lee. (Davis, Kristin) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/21 7:37 AM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (wgar, ) |
||
utility
1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/21 10:30 AM
*** Motion Hearing deadline terminated - Per RDA's chambers motions set for 8/16/2023 will be decided on the papers; no oral argument will be heard (tarm, ) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Thu 07/20 5:02 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doumar, George) |
|
13 | 13
10
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 07/20 5:00 PM
Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Zhidong Zhang. (Doumar, George) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 07/20 4:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Zhidong Zhang.(Doumar, George) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 07/20 4:56 PM
Memorandum in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Maureen (Yan Juan) Meng. (Doumar, George) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 07/20 4:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Maureen (Yan Juan) Meng.(Doumar, George) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/20 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by George Doumar on behalf of Maureen (Yan Juan) Meng, Zhidong Zhang (Doumar, George) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/17 2:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Maureen Meng on 06/26/2023, filed by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc., Joanna Lee. (Davis, Kristin) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/17 2:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Zhidong Zhang on 06/26/2023, filed by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc., Joanna Lee. (Davis, Kristin) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/28 4:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc.. (Davis, Kristin) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/22 12:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Maureen (Yan Juan) Meng, Zhidong Zhang, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(jlan) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 06/21 1:39 PM
Proposed Summons to Maureen Meng by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc., Joanna Lee. (Davis, Kristin) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 06/21 1:38 PM
Proposed Summons Maureen Meng by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc., Joanna Lee. (Davis, Kristin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 06/21 1:37 PM
Proposed Summons to Zhidong Zhang by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc., Joanna Lee. (Davis, Kristin) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/31 10:16 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8961454.), filed by Azalea Spa & Nails Inc., Joanna Lee.(Davis, Kristin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 06/01 10:05 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (swil) |