Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Raymond A Jackson
Referred: Douglas E Miller
Case #: 2:23-cv-00237
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 5:39 AM EST
Defendant
Frank Feia
Defendant
Andy Jassy
Plaintiff
Abdul Malik Elbey
3009 S. MILITARY HWY #115
Chesapeake, VA 23323


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
33 33 misc Docket Annotation Mon 04/28 10:04 AM
Submission by Abdul Malik Elbey. (epri, )
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Default Judgment Fri 04/25 4:19 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to AMAZON CEO ANDREW JASSY,FRANK FIEA, TREASEA SMITH by Abdul Malik Elbey. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
31 31 misc Affidavit Wed 01/22 3:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of EVIDENCE by Abdul Malik Elbey. (epri, )
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Docket Annotation Wed 01/22 3:05 PM
Settlement Demand by Abdul Malik Elbey. (epri, )
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION) Wed 01/22 3:04 PM
MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Abdul Malik Elbey. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
28 28 misc Affidavit Fri 01/17 3:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, December 23, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 12/27 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Abdul Malik Elbey(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
25 25 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Tue 12/17 9:20 AM
Memorandum in Opposition re23 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Andy Jassy. (Ingle, Gilda)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
26 26 misc Docket Annotation Tue 12/17 11:03 AM
Submission by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, December 02, 2024
24 24 service Affidavit of Service Tue 12/03 9:31 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Abdul Malik Elbey. (epri, )
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Default Judgment Tue 12/03 9:20 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Abdul Malik Elbey. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
22 22 misc Docket Annotation Tue 10/29 1:27 PM
Submission by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/28 3:47 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Frank Feia, Andy Jassy, filed by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
20 20 5 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/01 2:00 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed by filing a Second Amended Complaint within thirty days of the date of entry of this Order to Show Cause. A copy of this Order sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 10.1.24. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 10/1/24. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 09/09 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Abdul Malik Elbey (epri, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
18 18 misc Docket Annotation Mon 08/19 4:38 PM
Submission by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, July 11, 2024
17 17 misc Proposed Summons Thu 07/11 10:58 PM
Proposed Summons and Subpoena to Produce Documents by Abdul Malik Elbey(ptom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Monday, June 24, 2024
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Mon 06/24 3:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
15 15 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 06/24 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Abdul Malik Elbey(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, May 31, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/31 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley D. N. Jones on behalf of Andy Jassy (Jones, Ashley)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/31 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gilda Bethany Ingle on behalf of Andy Jassy (Ingle, Gilda)
Related: [-]
12 12 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Fri 05/31 9:08 AM
Memorandum in Opposition re11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Frank Feia, Andy Jassy. (Ingle, Gilda)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
11 11 motion Default Judgment Mon 05/13 2:25 PM
Motion for Entry of Default Judgment by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 29, 2024
10 10 misc Affidavit Mon 04/29 3:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF FACT by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, April 12, 2024
9 9 misc Docket Annotation Fri 04/12 12:49 PM
Submission by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, March 18, 2024
8 8 misc Docket Annotation Mon 03/18 3:14 PM
Submission by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, February 23, 2024
7 7 misc Docket Annotation Fri 02/23 3:35 PM
Submission by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/27 3:30 PM
Signed AMENDED COMPLAINT against Frank Feia, Andy Jassy, filed by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/19 4:38 PM
(Subject to Defect - Unsigned) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Frank Feia, Andy Jassy, filed by Abdul Malik Elbey.(afar)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint Tue 12/19 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Frank Feia, Andy Jassy, filed by Abdul Malik Elbey.(afar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 12/19 4:20 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's proposed filings. IF Plaintiff would like the Court to consider his Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is ORDERED to sign and resubmit his Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/19/2023. (copy mailed 12/19/23) (afar)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
2 2 misc Docket Annotation Fri 09/29 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Abdul Malik Elbey(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/31 3:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Abdul Malik Elbey.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (Subject to Defect - Unsigned) Proposed Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Envelope