Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Roderick C Young
Case #: 3:23-cv-00361
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 31, 2023
Terminated:Sep 12, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2023 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
Virginia Credit Union, Inc.
Represented By
John Peyton McGuire Boyd, Jr.
Williams Mullen (richmond)
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Brown
Represented By
Devon James Munro
Munro Byrd P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/12 3:17 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nicole Brown(Munro, Devon) (Main Document 15 replaced on 9/12/2023) (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Confirming Dismissal
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Wed 08/09 4:04 PM
ORDER- Plaintiff's Request for Stay13 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall have until September 9, 2023, to file a proposed dismissal order. If the parties fail to file such order on or before September 9, 2023, all deadlines will be reinstated and the case will proceed accordingly. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 8/9/2023. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement (by Attorney) Tue 08/08 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request for Stay of Deadlines by Nicole Brown (Munro, Devon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
12 12 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 07/20 4:57 PM
Memorandum in Support re11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Virginia Credit Union, Inc..(Boyd, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Glenda Brooks,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Brooks' Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Brooks' Affidavit
11 11 motion Compel Thu 07/20 4:55 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Virginia Credit Union, Inc.. (Boyd, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 07/20 4:53 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Virginia Credit Union, Inc.. (Boyd, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 06/21 3:36 PM
ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Deadline for Virginia Credit Union to Respond to Complaint (Motion for Extension) (ECF No.7 ). The Court FINDS that good cause exists to GRANT an extension of time so that Defendant may review the filings with recently retained counsel and prepare a response. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 6/21/2023. (sbea)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 06/21 9:02 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement by Virginia Credit Union, Inc. (Boyd, John). Modified on 6/21/2023. (sbea)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Wed 06/21 9:00 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Virginia Credit Union, Inc..(Boyd, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 06/07 1:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Brown Virginia Credit Union, Inc. served on 6/2/2023, answer due 6/23/2023 (Munro, Devon)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Wed 06/07 8:27 AM
Notice of Correction re:5 Affidavit of Service; See directions in ECF No.4 . Attorney selected the wrong filing event. The correct event is Summons Returned Executed to include the Summons, Proof of Service and the Affidavit. Selecting this event will set the answer due date. Clerk will set the answer due date for: June 23, 2023. No further action is required at this time. (sbea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/06 12:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, Discovery served on Christopher Shockey on 06/02/2023, filed by Nicole Brown. (Munro, Devon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 06/01 9:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Virginia Credit Union, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted . (sbea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Wed 05/31 7:53 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Nicole Brown. (Munro, Devon)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/31 7:47 PM
Civil Cover Sheet re1 Complaint by Nicole Brown. (Munro, Devon)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/31 7:41 PM
Complaint (Class Action) ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8961418.), filed by Nicole Brown.(Munro, Devon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B
utility Initial Case Assignment Thu 06/01 9:08 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (sbea)
Related: [-]